EP4001268 - METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING N-SUBSTITUTED PHENYL-5-HYDROXYMETHYL-2-OXAZOLIDINONE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 21.02.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 22.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.02.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Change - representative | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hangzhou Dike Technologies Co., Ltd. Room 1001, 1003, 1005, 1006, 1007, 1008, 1009, 1011 and 1013, Block F, Building 1 No.1378 Wenyi West Road Cangqian Street Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311100 / CN | [2022/21] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YU, Dihu Room 1001, 1003, 1005, 1006, 1007, 1008, 1009, 1011 and 1013, Block F, Building 1, No.1378 Wenyi West Road, Cangqian Street, Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311100 / CN | 02 /
WANG, Quan Room 1001, 1003, 1005, 1006, 1007, 1008, 1009, 1011 and 1013, Block F, Building 1, No.1378 Wenyi West Road, Cangqian Street, Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311100 / CN | 03 /
BAO, Lei Room 1001, 1003, 1005, 1006, 1007, 1008, 1009, 1011 and 1013, Block F, Building 1, No.1378 Wenyi West Road, Cangqian Street, Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311100 / CN | 04 /
HOU, Dapeng Room 1001, 1003, 1005, 1006, 1007, 1008, 1009, 1011 and 1013, Block F, Building 1, No.1378 Wenyi West Road, Cangqian Street, Yuhang District Hangzhou, Zhejiang 311100 / CN | [2022/21] | Representative(s) | karo IP Patentanwälte PartG mbB Steinstraße 16-18 40212 Düsseldorf / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/21] | Kreuels, Justus karo IP Patentanwälte Kahlhöfer Rößler Kreuels PartG mbB 30 01 02 40416 Düsseldorf / DE | Application number, filing date | 20855573.0 | 10.02.2020 | [2022/21] | WO2020CN74576 | Priority number, date | CN201910771167 | 20.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910771167 | [2022/21] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021031533 | Date: | 25.02.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/08] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4001268 | Date: | 25.05.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/21] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4001268 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.02.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 15.07.2022 | Classification | IPC: | C07D263/24, C07D413/10 | [2022/33] | CPC: |
C07D263/24 (EP,CN,IL,US);
C07D413/10 (EP,CN,IL)
|
Former IPC [2022/21] | C07D263/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/21] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG VON N-SUBSTITUIERTEM PHENYL-5-HYDROXYMETHYL-2-OXAZOLIDINON | [2022/21] | English: | METHOD FOR SYNTHESIZING N-SUBSTITUTED PHENYL-5-HYDROXYMETHYL-2-OXAZOLIDINONE | [2022/21] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE SYNTHÈSE DE PHÉNYLE-5-HYDROXYMÉTHYL-2-OXAZOLIDINONE N-SUBSTITUÉ | [2022/21] | Entry into regional phase | 15.02.2022 | Translation filed | 15.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/21] | 10.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 10.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 22.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 17.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 17.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 17.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.02.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 22.02.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]CN103391927 (LEE PHARMA LTD); | [A]CN103570640 (UNIV EAST CHINA NORMAL); | [A]CN105153059 (UNIV SOOCHOW); | by applicant | WO9507271 | CN1772750 | WO2012114355 | WO2014045292 |