EP3935413 - PARTIAL POINT CLOUD-BASED PEDESTRIANS' VELOCITY ESTIMATION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 20.06.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 12.03.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.12.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 19.11.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 02.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.06.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 24.07.2024 [2024/30] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Baidu.com Times Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 2/F A2 Zhongguancun Software Park 17th Building No. 8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | For all designated states Baidu USA LLC 1195 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | [2024/30] |
Former [2022/02] | For all designated states Baidu.com Times Technology (Beijing) Co., Ltd. 2/F A2 Zhongguancun Software Park 17th Building No. 8 Dongbeiwang West Road Haidian District Beijing 100080 / CN | ||
For all designated states Baidu USA LLC 1195 Bordeaux Drive Sunnyvale, California 94089 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LIU, Xiang Haidian District, Beijing 100080 / CN | 02 /
GAO, Bin Haidian District, Beijing 100080 / CN | 03 /
ZHU, Fan Sunnyvale California 94089 / US | [2022/02] | Representative(s) | Studio Torta S.p.A. Via Viotti, 9 10121 Torino / IT | [2022/02] | Application number, filing date | 20855818.9 | 15.05.2020 | [2022/02] | WO2020CN90419 | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021226980 | Date: | 18.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/46] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3935413 | Date: | 12.01.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.11.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/02] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3935413 | Date: | 24.07.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 18.11.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 24.02.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G01S17/931, G01S17/89, G05D1/00, G01S17/42, G01S7/48, G01S17/58, G06V20/58, G06V40/20, G06T7/246 | [2024/14] | CPC: |
G01S17/931 (EP,US);
B60W60/0011 (US);
G01S17/00 (US);
G01S17/42 (EP,US);
G01S17/58 (EP,US);
G01S17/89 (EP);
G01S7/4802 (EP,US);
G01S7/4808 (EP);
G05D1/0212 (EP);
G06T7/20 (US);
G06T7/246 (EP);
G06V10/25 (US);
G06V20/10 (US);
G06V20/56 (US);
G06V20/58 (EP);
B60W2420/408 (US);
B60W2554/4029 (US);
G06T2207/10028 (EP,US);
G06T2207/20068 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30241 (EP,US);
G06T2207/30252 (EP,US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/13] | G01S17/931, G06V40/20, G06V20/58, G06K9/62, G01S17/58, G01S7/48, G01S17/42, G05D1/02, G01S17/89 | ||
Former IPC [2022/02] | G01S17/93 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/02] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ZUM TEIL AUF PUNKTWOLKE BASIERTES VERFAHREN ZUR SCHÄTZUNG DER GESCHWINDIGKEIT EINES FUSSGÄNGERS | [2022/02] | English: | PARTIAL POINT CLOUD-BASED PEDESTRIANS' VELOCITY ESTIMATION METHOD | [2022/02] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'ESTIMATION DE LA VITESSE D'UN PIÉTON SUR LA BASE D'UN NUAGE DE POINTS PARTIEL | [2022/02] | Entry into regional phase | 01.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 01.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 01.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 01.03.2021 | Examination requested [2022/02] | 19.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 13.03.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 18.06.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 18.06.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 18.06.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 14.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2014347475 (DIVAKARAN AJAY [US], et al); | [A]US9522328 (LEYVAND TOMMER [US], et al); | [Y]US2019317219 (SMITH WARREN [US], et al); | [A]WO2020062031 (BAIDU COM TIMES TECH BEIJING CO LTD [CN], et al); | International search | [A]US2015161796 (CHOI EUN JIN [KR], et al); | [A]CN108732589 (BAIDU USA LLC); | [A]CN109886113 (GUIIN TOPINTELLIGENT COMMUNICATION TECH CO LTD); | [A]CN110554379 (NANJING HURYS INTELLIGENCE TECH CO LTD) |