EP4068239 - CALCULATING DEVICE, VEHICLE-MOUNTED DEVICE, AND AUTOMATED DRIVING SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 04.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.09.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | 03.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HITACHI, LTD. 6-6, Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 100-8280 / JP | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
OKOSHI, Kyoko c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008280 / JP | 02 /
NOMURA, Takashi c/o HITACHI LTD. 6-6 Marunouchi 1-chome Chiyoda-ku Tokyo 1008280 / JP | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20855844.5 | 26.08.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020JP32218 | Priority number, date | JP20190214763 | 27.11.2019 Original published format: JP 2019214763 | [2022/40] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021106295 | Date: | 03.06.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/22] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4068239 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 03.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | G08G1/0967, G08G1/16, B60W30/10, B60W40/02, G09B29/10, G05D1/225, G08G1/0968, B60W60/00, B62D15/02 | [2024/17] | CPC: |
B62D15/0255 (EP);
B60W60/001 (CN);
B60W60/0018 (EP,US);
B60W30/10 (CN);
B60W40/02 (CN);
B60W40/09 (US);
B60W60/0015 (EP);
B62D15/021 (US);
B62D15/025 (EP);
G06N5/022 (US);
G08G1/096725 (EP);
G08G1/096741 (EP);
G08G1/096775 (EP);
G08G1/096811 (EP);
G08G1/164 (EP);
G08G1/166 (EP);
G08G1/167 (EP);
G09B29/10 (EP);
B60W2552/53 (US);
B60W2554/4045 (US);
B60W2555/60 (EP);
B60W2556/45 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | G08G1/09, B60W30/10, B60W40/02, G09B29/10 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | BERECHNUNGSVORRICHTUNG, FAHRZEUGMONTIERTE VORRICHTUNG UND AUTOMATISIERTES FAHRSYSTEM | [2022/40] | English: | CALCULATING DEVICE, VEHICLE-MOUNTED DEVICE, AND AUTOMATED DRIVING SYSTEM | [2022/40] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE CALCUL, DISPOSITIF MONTÉ SUR VÉHICULE ET SYSTÈME DE CONDUITE AUTONOME | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 04.03.2021 | Translation filed | 04.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 04.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 04.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 04.03.2021 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 02.09.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.09.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US2016139594 (OKUMURA BUNYO [US], et al); | [XP]EP3690852 (VOLKSWAGEN AG [DE]) | International search | [Y]WO2017057528 (HATSUMEIYA CO LTD [JP]); | [XY]WO2017179151 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [A]WO2018087828 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]JP2018148284 (SOFTBANK CORP); | [Y]JP2019180051 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [A]JP2019179472 (TOSHIBA CORP, et al); | [PA]JP2020122789 (VOLKSWAGEN AG) | by applicant | JP2018155894 | JP2019214763 |