EP3968101 - SMART WATCH AND TOUCH CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 26.01.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 11.02.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.01.2024 | Withdrawal of application | published on 28.02.2024 [2024/09] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Anhui Huami Information Technology Co., Ltd. 7/F, Building B2 Huami Global Innovation Center No.900, Wangjiang West Road China (Anhui) Pilot Free Trade Zone Hefei, Anhui 230088 / CN | [2022/11] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LV, Baitao 7/F, Building B2, Huami Global Innovation Center No.900 Wangjiang West Road, China (Anhui) Pilot Free Trade Zone Hefei, Anhui 243000 / CN | 02 /
MIN, Bing 7/F, Building B2, Huami Global Innovation Center No.900 Wangjiang West Road, China (Anhui) Pilot Free Trade Zone Hefei, Anhui 243000 / CN | 03 /
QIAO, Zhimin 7/F, Building B2, Huami Global Innovation Center No.900 Wangjiang West Road, China (Anhui) Pilot Free Trade Zone Hefei, Anhui 243000 / CN | [2022/11] | Representative(s) | Bandpay & Greuter 11 rue Christophe Colomb 75008 Paris / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2022/11] | Bandpay & Greuter 30, rue Notre-Dame des Victoires 75002 Paris / FR | Application number, filing date | 20856068.0 | 18.08.2020 | [2022/11] | WO2020CN109875 | Priority number, date | CN201910812669 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910812669 | [2022/11] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021036873 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3968101 | Date: | 16.03.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/11] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G04G21/08, G06F3/041, G06F1/16, G06F3/044 | [2022/25] | CPC: |
G06F3/0446 (EP,US);
G06F3/0416 (CN,US);
G04C17/0091 (US);
G04G21/00 (CN);
G04G21/08 (EP);
G06F1/163 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/11] | G04G21/00, G06F3/041 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/11] | Title | German: | INTELLIGENTE UHR UND BERÜHRUNGSSTEUERUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR | [2022/11] | English: | SMART WATCH AND TOUCH CONTROL METHOD THEREFOR | [2022/11] | French: | MONTRE INTELLIGENTE ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE COMMANDE TACTILE | [2022/11] | Entry into regional phase | 07.12.2021 | Translation filed | 07.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 07.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 07.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 07.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/11] | 22.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.01.2024 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2024/09] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]US9348320 (DEFAZIO MICHAEL JOSEPH [CA], et al) [X] 1,3-5,7-10,12,13,15,16 * column 2, lines 22-55 * * column 3, lines 17-60 * * column 4, line 20 - column 6, line 3 * * column 6, line 27 - column 7, line 23 * * column 9, line 50 - column 10, line 34 * * figures 1, 4-7, 9 * [I] 2,6,11,14; | [A]US2016306328 (KO DONGSEUCK [KR], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0073] , [0 75] , [0 76] , [0 80] , [0 81] * * paragraphs [0086] , [0 89] , [0 96] - [0098] ** figures 5, 6 *; | [A]US2017068217 (CHEN JR-HONG [CN], et al) [A] 1-16 * paragraphs [0054] - [0058] * * figures 9, 10 *; | [XI]US2017300016 (LIDER BRETT [US], et al) [X] 1,3-5,8-10,12,13,15,16 * paragraphs [0013] - [0028]; figures 1A-2 * * paragraphs [0051] - [0058]; figures 3A-3H * * paragraphs [0060] - [0063]; figures 4A-4D * [I] 2,11; | [A]WO2019040876 (GARMIN SWITZERLAND GMBH [CH], et al) [A] 1-16 * abstract * * figures 1A-11B * |