EP4021724 - LAMINATED GLAZING HAVING HOLOGRAPHIC FILM LAMINATED THEREIN [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 30.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Central Glass Company, Limited 5253, Oaza Okiube Ube-shi, Yamaguchi 755-0001 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POHLEN, Markus Walter Im Hanfgarten 10a 54558 Mückeln / DE | 02 /
CHRISTMAN, Steven Scott 1011 Chelsea Dr. Goodlettsville, Tennessee 37072 / US | 03 /
CURTIS, Emily Anne 610 Sylvan Heights Way Nashville, Tennessee 37209 / US | 04 /
MATSUDA, Yu 6967 Sonya Dr. Nashville, Tennessee 37209 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20856520.0 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020US48418 | Priority number, date | US201962894419P | 30.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962894419 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041817 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021724 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 22.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B32B17/10, C09K11/00 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
B32B17/10036 (EP,US);
B32B17/10431 (US);
B32B17/10165 (EP);
B32B17/10706 (EP,US);
B32B2250/03 (EP);
B32B2307/40 (US);
B32B2307/732 (EP,US);
B32B2457/20 (EP);
B32B2605/00 (EP);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERBUNDGLASSCHEIBE MIT DARIN LAMINIERTER HOLOGRAFISCHER SCHICHT | [2022/27] | English: | LAMINATED GLAZING HAVING HOLOGRAPHIC FILM LAMINATED THEREIN | [2022/27] | French: | VITRAGE FEUILLETÉ AYANT UN FILM HOLOGRAPHIQUE STRATIFIÉ À L'INTÉRIEUR DE CELUI-CI | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 18.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 18.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 18.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 19.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 19.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 31.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 29.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]US2019101865 (POPKOVA VERA YA [RU], et al) [I] 1-15 * figures 2-3 * * claims 1-15 ** paragraph [0010] - paragraph [0097] * | International search | [A]WO2013005745 (ASAHI GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [A] 1-17* pg 10, para 6-7 *; | [X]US2019101865 (POPKOVA VERA YA [RU], et al) [X] 1-17 * para [0010], [0022]-[0023], [0036], [0060], [0069]-[0072] *; | [XP]DE202019104803U (SAINT GOBAIN SEKURIT DEUTSCHLAND GMBH & CO KG [DE]) [XP] 1-17 * Entire Document *; | [AP]US2020230924 (BRONSTEIN WLADISLAW [DE], et al) [AP] 1-17 * Entire Document * |