EP4023741 - CELL PRODUCTION DEVICE AND CELL PRODUCTION METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states FANUC CORPORATION 3580 Shibokusa Aza-Komanba Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | For all designated states I Peace, Inc. 809 San Antonio Road, Suite No.7 Palo Alto, CA 94303 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BAN, Kazunori c/o FANUC CORPORATION, 3580, Shibokusa Aza- Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 02 /
KINOSHITA, Satoshi c/o FANUC CORPORATION, 3580, Shibokusa Aza- Komanba, Oshino-mura Minamitsuru-gun, Yamanashi 401-0597 / JP | 03 /
TANABE, Koji c/o I Peace, Inc., 809 San Antonio Rd. Suite 7 Palo Alto, California 94303 / US | 04 /
HIRAIDE, Ryoji c/o I Peace, Ltd., 139 Shinnyo-cho, Jyodoji, Sakyo-ku Kyoto-shi, Kyoto 606-8414 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte und Rechtsanwalt PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Schmidt, Steffen J. Wuesthoff & Wuesthoff Patentanwälte PartG mbB Schweigerstrasse 2 81541 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20856545.7 | 28.05.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP21240 | Priority number, date | US201962893605P | 29.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962893605 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038996 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023741 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.10.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C12M1/00, C12M3/00, C12M1/42, C12M1/34, B01L3/00 | [2023/45] | CPC: |
C12M23/42 (EP);
C12M41/48 (US);
C12M23/04 (US);
C12M23/10 (EP);
C12M23/14 (US);
C12M23/22 (US);
C12M23/34 (US);
C12M23/38 (US);
C12M25/06 (US);
C12M27/02 (US);
C12M29/00 (US);
C12M29/18 (EP);
C12M33/04 (US);
C12M35/08 (EP);
C12M41/00 (EP,US);
C12M41/36 (EP);
C12M41/44 (EP);
C12M47/04 (US);
B01L3/502707 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | C12M1/00, C12M3/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ZELLHERSTELLUNG UND VERFAHREN ZUR ZELLHERSTELLUNG | [2022/27] | English: | CELL PRODUCTION DEVICE AND CELL PRODUCTION METHOD | [2022/27] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE PRODUCTION DE CELLULE ET MÉTHODE DE PRODUCTION DE CELLULE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.02.2022 | Translation filed | 17.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 21.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.02.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6645432 (ANDERSON JANELLE R [US], et al) [A] 13,14 * figures 1-3 * * column 8, line 61 - column 9, line 59 ** column 11, lines 20-25 *; | [XI]US2014193895 (SMITH TIMOTHY J N [CA], et al) [X] 1-4,8,15,18,19 * paragraphs [0173] - [0185]; figures 6-10 * [I] 5-7,9,16,17; | [A]US10227554 (JANAS MICHELLE LOUISE [GB]) [A] 2,3 * paragraphs [0004] - [0022] - [0035] , [0039] - [0046]; figures 1,2 *; | [XI]EP3530727 (TANABE KOJI [US], et al) [X] 1,4-11 * paragraphs [0036] , [0041] , [0051] - [0053] - [0060] , [0061] - [0088] - [0099] , [0101] - [0104] - [0107] , [0113] , [0117] , [0118]; figures 1-5,7 * [I] 2,3,12-19 | International search | [Y]JPH09500818 [Y] 1-17 * 1 *; | [Y]CN103667054 (SCIENT RES TRAINING CT FOR CHINESE ASTRONAUTS, et al) [Y] 1-17 * [0044]-[0048], 1-3 *; | [Y]JP2014064475 (TERUMO CORP) [Y] 1-17 * [0036] *; | [A]WO2017038887 (I PEACE INC [US], et al) [A] 1-20; | [A]JP2017046592 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD) [A] 1-20; | [XA]JP2018513684 [X] 18-20 * [0083]-[0102], [0276], 1, 5A * [A] 1-17; | [XA]WO2019043130 (PHILIP MORRIS PRODUCTS SA [CH]) [X] 18-20 * , 13 8 11, 15 5 8, 2 - 4 * [A] 1-17; | [PA]WO2020040118 (I PEACE INC [US], et al) [PA] 1-20; | [PA]WO2020040135 (TANABE KOJI [US], et al)[PA] 1-20 | by applicant | JP2002512783 | JP2005080607 | WO2007052716 | JP4183742B | WO2014049701 | JP2014226623 | WO2017154880 | JP2017221166 | JP2018019685 | WO2018154788 |