EP4024509 - NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 26.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Panasonic Intellectual Property Management Co., Ltd. 1-61, Shiromi 2-chome Chuo-ku Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOGA Masahiro Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 02 /
HASEGAWA Masaki Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | 03 /
FUKUOKA Takahiro Osaka-shi, Osaka 540-6207 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Novagraaf International SA Chemin de l'Echo 3 1213 Onex, Geneva / CH | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20856852.7 | 21.07.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP28283 | Priority number, date | JP20190158076 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019158076 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021039217 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024509 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 28.03.2024 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/133, H01M4/36, H01M4/38, H01M4/587 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H01M4/364 (EP,US);
H01M4/587 (EP,US);
H01M10/0525 (EP,US);
H01M4/133 (EP);
H01M4/48 (US);
H01M4/483 (EP);
H01M4/624 (US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
H01M2004/027 (EP,US);
Y02E60/10 (EP)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | NEGATIVE ELEKTRODE FÜR SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE UND SEKUNDÄRBATTERIE MIT WASSERFREIEM ELEKTROLYT | [2022/27] | English: | NEGATIVE ELECTRODE FOR SECONDARY BATTERY AND NON-AQUEOUS ELECTROLYTE SECONDARY BATTERY | [2022/27] | French: | ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE POUR BATTERIE SECONDAIRE ET BATTERIE SECONDAIRE À ÉLECTROLYTE NON AQUEUX | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.02.2022 | Translation filed | 25.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 25.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XA]US2013273433 (JOUANNEAU-SI LARBI SEVERINE [FR], et al) | International search | [A]JP2004349164 (NEC CORP); | [A]JP2007165061 (CANON KK); | [X]JP2014503972 ; | [A]JP2014107013 (DOW CORNING TORAY CO LTD); | [A]JP2015125815 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO) | by applicant | JP2014067583 |