EP4021912 - PRODRUGS OF THE TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR FOR TREATING CANCER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Risen (Suzhou) Pharma Tech Co., Ltd. Suite 501-Building G 388 Ruoshui Road Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LU, Jiasheng No. 559, 1357 Huqingping Highway Shanghai Shanghai 201702 / CN | 02 /
GU, Jiamin Room 507, 508 Jinmen Road Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 03 /
CHEN, Gang 388 Ruoshui Street, Suite 501 - Building G Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 04 /
ZHANG, Qiguo 388 Ruoshui Street, Suite 501 - Building G Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 05 /
SUN, Chengyong 388 Ruoshui Street, Suite 501 - Building G Suzhou, Jiangsu 215000 / CN | 06 /
KONG, Xianqi 12, rue Papillon Dollard-des-Ormeaux Québec H9B 3J7 / CA | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Høiberg P/S Adelgade 12 1304 Copenhagen K / DK | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20857153.9 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CA51177 | Priority number, date | CN201910817505 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910817505 | CN201910818675 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910818675 | CN201910818779 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910818779 | US202062994364P | 25.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062994364 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021035360 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021912 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CA | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07F9/6558, A61K31/4439, A61K31/675, A61P35/00, C07D401/06, C07D401/14, C07D405/12 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
C07F9/65583 (EP,IL);
A61P35/00 (EP,IL);
C07D401/06 (EP,IL);
C07D401/14 (EP,IL);
C07D405/12 (EP,IL);
Y02P20/55 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | C07F9/6558, A61K31/4439, A61K31/675, A61P35/00, C07D401/06, C07D401/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | PRODRUGS DES TYROSINKINASEINHIBITORS ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON KREBS | [2022/27] | English: | PRODRUGS OF THE TYROSINE KINASE INHIBITOR FOR TREATING CANCER | [2022/27] | French: | PROMÉDICAMENTS DE L'INHIBITEUR DE TYROSINE KINASE POUR LE TRAITEMENT DU CANCER | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 21.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 16.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]CN106317017 (LI JIANCHENG) [X] 1,2,9,11-14 * compounds 1, 2 and the de-boc variant of compound 2 on page 5 * * Use of compounds as prodrug of the parent drug Axitinib and for therapeutic treatment of ophthalmic diseases, where modified pharmacokinetics and solubility are required: see paragraphs 4-8 *[I] 3-8,15 | International search | [Y]WO0102369 (AGOURON PHARMA [US]) [Y] 13-26, 31-37 **see the whole document** D5: CHEKAL B. P. et al., "Development of an Efficient Pd-Catalyzed Coupling Process for *; | [X]CN106336397 (GUO MINGSHAN) [X] 1-12,27-29 **see claims 1-5 and the examples**; | [X]CN106478596 (LI JIANCHENG) [X] 1-5, 10-12, 27-29 **see claims 1-4, 6-9 and the examples**; | [PX]WO2019196945 (HINOVA PHARMACEUTICALS INC [CN]) [PX] 1-5 **see p. 8**; | [X] - Chekal et al., "Development of an Efficient Pd-Catalyzed Coupling Process for Axitinib", Organic Process Research & Development, (20140000), vol. 18, no. 1, pages 266 - 274, XP055636708 [X] 1-5 **see scheme 6** DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/op400088k |