EP4017108 - DETERMINATION DEVICE, DETERMINATION METHOD, AND DETERMINATION PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 Database last updated on 12.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HORITA, Koki c/o Sony Mobile Communications Inc., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 02 /
IKENAGA, Toshiya c/o Sony Mobile Communications Inc., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 03 /
UEURA, Daichi c/o Sony Mobile Communications Inc., 4-12-3, Higashi-Shinagawa, Shinagawa-ku Tokyo 140-0002 / JP | 04 /
ITAGAKI, Takeshi c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | D Young & Co LLP 3 Noble Street London EC2V 7BQ / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | D Young & Co LLP 120 Holborn London EC1N 2DY / GB | Application number, filing date | 20857411.1 | 23.04.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020JP17570 | Priority number, date | WO2019JP34252 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: PCT/JP2019/034252 | [2022/25] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038961 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4017108 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W36/32, // H04W36/14 | [2022/35] | CPC: |
H04W36/324 (EP,US);
H04W36/0083 (EP);
H04W36/00837 (EP);
H04W36/1446 (EP,US);
H04W36/304 (EP,US);
H04W84/12 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/25] | H04W36/14 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | BESTIMMUNGSVORRICHTUNG, BESTIMMUNGSVERFAHREN UND BESTIMMUNGSPROGRAMM | [2022/25] | English: | DETERMINATION DEVICE, DETERMINATION METHOD, AND DETERMINATION PROGRAM | [2022/25] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTERMINATION, PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION ET PROGRAMME DE DÉTERMINATION | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | Translation filed | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 03.02.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.02.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 14.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 15.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]EP1585354 (SHARP KK [JP]); | [IY]EP2410789 (ALCATEL LUCENT [FR]); | [Y]US2018234900 (SANKARANARAYAN MUKUND [US], et al); | [XYI]US2019082370 (ALFRED JOSEPH ANDERSON [US], et al); | International search | [XY]JP2004208001 (SHARP KK); | [Y]WO2009110103 (HITACHI LTD [JP], et al); | [XY]JP2014036317 (HITACHI LTD); | [Y]CN109068350 (UNIV XIDIAN) | by applicant | JP2007509590 | JP2009503914 | JP2010523024 |