EP4004690 - METHOD FOR INDEXING AND RETRIEVING TEXT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | |||
Former [2022/22] | METHODS FOR INDEXING AND RETRIEVING TEXT | ||
[2023/51] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 15.03.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 27.11.2023 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.09.2022 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 29.04.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 17.04.2024 [2024/16] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shoeibi, Lisa 4500 Williams Dr. Ste 212 145 Georgetown TX 78633 / US | [2022/22] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/22] | Representative(s) | Loo, Chi Ching, et al Albright IP Limited County House Bayshill Road Cheltenham, Gloucestershire GL50 3BA / GB | [2022/22] | Application number, filing date | 20857785.8 | 28.08.2020 | [2022/22] | WO2020US48629 | Priority number, date | US201962894386P | 30.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962894386 P | [2022/22] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041983 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4004690 | Date: | 01.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/22] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4004690 | Date: | 17.04.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/16] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 25.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B42F21/06, G06F3/00, G06F7/00, G06F3/12, G06F16/31 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
G06F16/31 (EP,US);
B42D3/006 (US);
B42F21/06 (EP,US);
G06F16/345 (US);
G06F3/1204 (EP,US);
G06F3/1243 (US);
G06F16/986 (US);
G06F3/1242 (EP);
G06F3/125 (US);
|
Former IPC [2022/39] | G06F3/00, G06F7/00, G06K9/62, B42F21/06 | ||
Former IPC [2022/22] | G06F3/00, G06F7/00, G06K9/62 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/22] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM INDEXIEREN UND ABRUFEN VON TEXT | [2022/22] | English: | METHOD FOR INDEXING AND RETRIEVING TEXT | [2023/51] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'INDEXATION ET DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE TEXTE | [2023/51] |
Former [2022/22] | METHODS FOR INDEXING AND RETRIEVING TEXT | ||
Former [2022/22] | PROCÉDÉS D'INDEXATION ET DE RÉCUPÉRATION DE TEXTE | Entry into regional phase | 24.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 24.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/22] | 25.08.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.09.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.01.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 09.05.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 21.08.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 28.11.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 08.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 12.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 15.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US3958816 (REMMEY III ROBERT H); | [A]US5468085 (KLINE BRANT D [US]); | [A]US5641182 (SCHWANDT BRUCE [US]); | [A]WO0119623 (DOTSENKO ANATOLY MIKHAILOVICH [UA]); | [A]US2012023447 (HOSHINO MASAAKI [JP], et al); | [A]US2012105888 (NAKAYAMA TORU [JP]); | [XA]US9987877 (DUNN NATHAN T [US], et al) | International search | [A]US5946678 (AALBERSBERG IJSBRAND JAN [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [YA]US2008027933 (HUSSAM ALI A [US]) [Y] 2,9 * entire document * [A] 16-20; | [A]US2008033936 (FRANK JOHN R [US]) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [XYA]US2008263032 (VAILAYA ADITYA [US], et al) [X] 1 * entire document * [Y] 2,9 [A] 3-8, 10-20; | [A]US2010232719 (VINCENT LUC [US], et al) [A] 1-20* entire document *; | [A]US8332439 (MARVIT DAVID L [US], et al) [A] 16-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2014337335 (GORDON MICHAEL M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document *; | [A]US2017147198 (HERZ SCOTT M [US], et al) [A] 1-20 * entire document * | by applicant | US2008027933 | US2008263032 | US9987877 |