Date | Description | European Patent Bulletin date, issue number |
---|---|---|
28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
27.02.2024 | The date on which the examining division becomes responsible, has been established | |
27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | |
11.08.2023 | Supplementary search report | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
11.08.2023 | Change - classification | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
11.08.2023 | Change - classification | published on 13.09.2023 [2023/37] |
28.06.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
04.11.2022 | Change: Validation states | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
04.11.2022 | Change - extension states | published on 07.12.2022 [2022/49] |
03.06.2022 | Publication in section I.1 EP Bulletin | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
03.06.2022 | Request for examination filed | published on 06.07.2022 [2022/27] |
10.05.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
03.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
02.04.2022 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | |
16.03.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
25.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
23.02.2022 | Amendment by applicant | |
22.02.2022 | Change - representative | |
22.02.2022 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
09.04.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor | |
05.03.2021 | PCT data prior to European publication | |
05.03.2021 | New entry: applicant or inventor |