EP4024510 - METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DOPED ELECTRODE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POWER STORAGE DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Musashi Energy Solutions Co., Ltd. 8565, Nishi-ide, Ooizumi-cho Hokuto-shi, Yamanashi 409-1501 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SUZUKI, Hirobumi c/o JSR Corporation, 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 02 /
KOJIMA, Kenji c/o JSR Corporation, 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 03 /
NAOI, Masaya c/o JSR Corporation, 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 04 /
ANDO, Nobuo c/o JSR Corporation, 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 05 /
YAKUSHIJI, Hiroki c/o JSR Corporation, 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 06 /
AITA, Kazunari c/o JSR Corporation, 1-9-2, Higashi-Shinbashi, Minato-ku Tokyo 105-8640 / JP | 07 /
YAMAMOTO, Masahiro c/o MUSASHI ENERGY SOLUTIONS CO., LTD., 8565, Nishi-ide, Ooizumi-cho Hokuto-shi, Yamanashi 409-1501 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | TBK Bavariaring 4-6 80336 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20857809.6 | 25.06.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP25044 | Priority number, date | JP20190158839 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019158839 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021039085 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024510 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H01G11/50, H01G11/86, H01G11/06, H01G11/84, H01M4/04, H01M4/139, H01M4/13, H01M10/0525, H01M10/058, // H01M4/02 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
H01M10/058 (EP);
H01M4/139 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01G11/06 (EP,CN,KR);
H01G11/50 (EP,CN,KR);
H01G11/84 (EP,CN);
H01G11/86 (EP,CN,KR);
H01M10/0525 (EP);
H01M4/0404 (KR,US);
H01M4/0409 (KR);
H01M4/0445 (EP);
H01M4/0459 (EP);
H01M4/13 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H01M4/139, H01G11/06, H01G11/50 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER DOTIERTEN ELEKTRODE UND VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER ENERGIESPEICHERVORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING DOPED ELECTRODE, AND METHOD FOR MANUFACTURING POWER STORAGE DEVICE | [2022/27] | French: | APPAREIL DE FABRICATION D'ÉLECTRODE DOPÉE ET PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE DISPOSITIF DE STOCKAGE D'ÉNERGIE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 22.02.2022 | Translation filed | 22.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 22.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 27.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.06.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.06.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]EP0752727 (GEN MOTORS CORP [US]); | [XAI]US2012048739 (CHOI DONG HYEOK [KR], et al); | [A]EP2747176 (TOKYO ELECTRON LTD [JP]); | [XAI]US2016190545 (MOMO JUNPEI [JP], et al); | [A]CN105869917 (712TH RES INST CSIC, et al); | [A]JP2018170251 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [XAI]US2019074143 (NAOI MASAYA [JP], et al) | International search | [A]JP2018170251 (MITSUI CHEMICALS INC, et al); | [A]JP2018206560 (SHINETSU CHEMICAL CO); | [A]CN109742325 (SPRINGPOWER TECH SHENZHEN CO LTD, et al); | [A]JP2019145386 (NISSAN MOTOR, et al) | by applicant | JPH10308212 | JP2005123175 | JP2006107795 | JP2008077963 | JP2009246137 | JP2012049543 | JP2012049544 | JP2013258392 |