EP4021230 - INFANT SWADDLE SACK WITH HARNESS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 07.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states HB Innovations, Inc. 3115 S. La Cienega Blvd. Los Angeles, CA 90016 / US | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KARP, Harvey, Neil 31115 S. La Cienega Blvd. Los Angeles, CA 90016 / US | 02 /
KARP, Nina, Montee 31115 S. La Cienega Blvd. Los Angeles, CA 90016 / US | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/27] | Ferreccio, Rinaldo Botti & Ferrari S.p.A. Via Cappellini, 11 20124 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 20858244.5 | 25.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020US47819 | Priority number, date | US201962891789P | 26.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962891789 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021041425 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021230 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 16.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A41B13/06, A47D9/00, A47D15/00 | [2023/51] | CPC: |
A41B13/065 (EP,US);
A47D15/008 (EP,US);
A47D9/00 (EP,US)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | A41B13/06, A41B13/00, A41D11/00, A47D7/00, A47D13/08, A47D15/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | KINDERWICKELSACK MIT GURT | [2022/27] | English: | INFANT SWADDLE SACK WITH HARNESS | [2022/27] | French: | SAC À EMMAILLOTER POUR NOURRISSON AVEC HARNAIS | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 23.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 23.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 03.06.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 03.06.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 10.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 07.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]US2651781 (BUCHHOLZ GEORGIA R) [X] 1,3,6-8 * column 3, line 9 - column 4, line 23; figures 3,4 * [Y] 10,11 [I] 2,4,5,9; | [XI]DE881931 (KRAUSS EUGENIE) [X] 1,3 * page 1, column 2, line 35 - page 2, column 1, line 44 * * page 2, column 2, line 65 - page 2, column 2, line 76; figures 1,2,4 * [I] 2,4-6,9; | [A]US2007061968 (FADER SARATH [US]) [A] 9,11 * abstract ** paragraph [0064] *; | [Y]US2017245555 (KARP HARVEY NEIL [US]) [Y] 10,11 * abstract * * paragraph [0081] - paragraph [0082] *; | [A]WO2018236216 (MAKE MORE HAPPEN HOLDING B V [NL]) [A] 1-9 * abstract * * page 23, line 29 - page 24, line 12 * | International search | [Y]US2007061968 (FADER SARATH [US]) [Y] 17, 19 * entire document *; | [Y]US2010275373 (KAPLAN JOEL [US], et al) [Y] 1-22, 37-45 * entire document *; | [A]US2011179546 (MILLETTE ANGELIQUE [US], et al) [A] 1-22, 37-45 * entire document *; | [A]AU2012265561 (VAN GISBERGEN RUTHERFORD MIRIAM PETRONELLA [NZ]) [A] 1-22, 37-45* entire document *; | [Y]GB2515400 (TAILORED TECH INC [US]) [Y] 14 * entire document *; | [Y]US2017245555 (KARP HARVEY NEIL [US]) [Y] 16, 18, 19, 37-45 * entire document *; | [A]US2018007976 (LAGER BENGT [US]) [A] 1-22, 37-45 * entire document *; | [Y]GB2528702 (KERRIKIDS LTD [GB]) [Y] 1-22, 37-45 * entire document * |