EP4021438 - PATENTIFLORIN A ANALOGS AS ANTIVIRAL AGENTS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 19.07.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Hong Kong Baptist University Kowloon Tong Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Hongjie Hong Kong Baptist University, Kowloon Tong Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 02 /
LI, Wanfei Hong Kong Baptist University, Kowloon Tong Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | 03 /
TSANG, Nga Yi Hong Kong Baptist University, Kowloon Tong Kowloon Hong Kong / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Daniels, Stefanie Lisa IP2 Patentanwalts GmbH Schlossstraße 523-525 41238 Mönchengladbach / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20858852.5 | 26.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN111463 | Priority number, date | US201962891441P | 26.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962891441 P | US202016947935 | 25.08.2020 Original published format: US202016947935 | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021037077 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021438 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 10.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/34, A61K31/7028, C07D407/02, C07H15/252, C07H17/04, A61P31/00 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
A61K31/381 (EP,US);
A61K31/69 (EP,US);
A61K31/365 (EP,US);
A61K31/443 (EP,US);
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (EP,US);
A61K31/7048 (EP,US);
A61K31/706 (EP,US);
A61P31/16 (EP,US);
A61P31/18 (EP,US)
(-)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | PATENTIFLORIN-A-ANALOGA ALS VIRUZIDE | [2022/27] | English: | PATENTIFLORIN A ANALOGS AS ANTIVIRAL AGENTS | [2022/27] | French: | ANALOGUES DE LA PATENTIFLORINE A UTILISÉS COMME AGENTS ANTIVIRAUX | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.01.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.01.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.01.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.01.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 04.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]WO2013019662 (UNIV ILLINOIS [US], et al) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-13 * example all; claims 1,9,10,11 * [Y] 1-13; | [X]CN103127159 (GUANGXI BOTAN GARDEN MEDICINAL PLANTS) [X] 1,2,4-9,11-13 * claims 2,3 *; | [XPI]WO2019182947 (PURDUE RESEARCH FOUNDATION [US]) [XP] 1-13 * the whole document * [I] 1-13; | [E]US2021230149 (DAVISSON VINCENT JO [US], et al) [E] 1-13 * the whole document *; | [X] - PATOOMRATANA TUCHINDA ET AL, "Dichapetalin-Type Triterpenoids and Lignans from the Aerial Parts of Phyllanthus acutissima", JOURNAL OF NATURAL PRODUCTS, (20080401), vol. 71, no. 4, doi:10.1021/np7007347, ISSN 0163-3864, pages 655 - 663, XP055154519 [X] 1,2,4-9,11-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/np7007347 | [XY] - AARON LINDSTROM ET AL, "Phenotypic Prioritization of Diphyllin Derivatives That Block Filoviral Cell Entry by Vacuolar (H+)-ATPase Inhibition", CHEMMEDCHEM COMMUNICATIONS, WILEY-VCH, DE, (20181128), vol. 13, no. 24, doi:10.1002/CMDC.201800587, ISSN 1860-7179, pages 2664 - 2676, XP072417229 [X] 1-13 * tables 1-3; compounds 2a-2i * [Y] 1-13 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1002/cmdc.201800587 | [Y] - CHEN HUI-WEN ET AL, "Inhibitory and combinatorial effect of diphyllin, a v-ATPase blocker, on influenza viruses", ANTIVIRAL RESEARCH, ELSEVIER BV, NL, (20130629), vol. 99, no. 3, doi:10.1016/J.ANTIVIRAL.2013.06.014, ISSN 0166-3542, pages 371 - 382, XP028728462 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.antiviral.2013.06.014 |