EP4024283 - METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DATA, AND RELATED PRODUCT [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 28.06.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.05.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Shanghai Cambricon Information Technology Co., Ltd Floor 6, Block B, No.168 Tonghui Road Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHANG, Yao Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | 02 /
JIANG, Guang Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | 03 /
ZHANG, Xishan Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | 04 /
ZHOU, Shiyi Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | 05 /
HUANG, Di Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | 06 /
LIU, Chang Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | 07 /
GUO, Jiaming Floor 6, Block B, No. 168, Tonghui Road, Pudong New Area Shanghai 201306 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20858900.2 | 21.05.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN91578 | Priority number, date | CN201910804627 | 28.08.2019 Original published format: CN201910804627 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021036362 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024283 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/04, G06N3/063, G06N3/084 | [2023/37] | CPC: |
G06N3/063 (EP,US);
G06N3/045 (CN);
G06N3/04 (EP,US);
G06F7/483 (US);
G06N3/044 (CN);
G06N3/048 (CN);
G06N3/084 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G06N3/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR DATENVERARBEITUNG UND ENTSPRECHENDES PRODUKT | [2022/27] | English: | METHOD AND APPARATUS FOR PROCESSING DATA, AND RELATED PRODUCT | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE DONNÉES ET PRODUIT ASSOCIÉ | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 21.12.2021 | Translation filed | 21.12.2021 | National basic fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Search fee paid | 21.12.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 21.12.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 21.12.2021 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 15.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.04.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.05.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2019095777 (KIM DO-YUN [KR], et al) [X] 1-15* paragraph [0070] - paragraph [0082]; figures 10, 11 *; | [X] - PELUSO VALENTINO ET AL, "Enabling Energy-Efficient Unsupervised Monocular Depth Estimation on ARMv7-Based Platforms", 2019 DESIGN, AUTOMATION & TEST IN EUROPE CONFERENCE & EXHIBITION (DATE), EDAA, (20190325), doi:10.23919/DATE.2019.8714893, pages 1703 - 1708, XP033550041 [X] 1-15 * Sections IV and V.;; figures 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.23919/DATE.2019.8714893 | [X] - GUO KAIYUAN ET AL, "Angel-Eye: A Complete Design Flow for Mapping CNN onto Customized Hardware", 2016 IEEE COMPUTER SOCIETY ANNUAL SYMPOSIUM ON VLSI (ISVLSI), IEEE, (20160711), doi:10.1109/ISVLSI.2016.129, pages 24 - 29, XP032958155 [X] 1-15 * Sections IV and V.;; figures 3, 4 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/ISVLSI.2016.129 | International search | [A]US7406451 (MRZIGLOD THOMAS [DE], et al) [A] 1-21* entire document *; | [A]CN106485316 (BEIJING BAIDU NETCOM SCI & TEC) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [X]CN107688855 (SHENZHEN DEEPHI TECH CO LTD) [X] 1-19 * description, paragraphs [0046] - [0078], and figures 2-5 *; | [Y]CN107688855 (SHENZHEN DEEPHI TECH CO LTD) [Y] 20, 21 * description, paragraphs [0046] - [0078], and figures 2-5 *; | [A]CN109934331 (CAMBRICON TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * entire document *; | [Y]CN109993296 (CAMBRICON TECH CO LTD) [Y] 20, 21 * description, paragraphs [0202]-[0207] *; | [A]CN109993296 (CAMBRICON TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-19 * description, paragraphs [0202]-[0207] *; | [A]CN110059733 (SUZHOU KEDA TECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [A] 1-21 * entire document * |