Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022277463 | Global Dossier | 01.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US202017638073 | 26.08.2020 | WO2020IL50932 | 26.08.2020 | US201962891515 | 26.08.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4022569 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | A4 | EP4022569 | 06.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020IL50932 | 26.08.2020 | US201962891515 | 26.08.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021038565 | Global Dossier | 04.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | US201962891515 | 26.08.2019 |