EP4022569 - TRACKING DYNAMICS USING A COMPUTERIZED DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Additional fee for renewal fee: payment of fee | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states AGT International GmbH Leutschenbachstrasse 95 8050 Zurich / CH | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SCHLATTMANN, Markus Nordend 41 64347 Griesheim / DE | 02 /
BADER, Thomas Hans-Boeckler-Strasse 24 64319 Pfungstadt / DE | 03 /
BIEHL, Robert Wilhelminenstrase 19 64293 Darmstadt / DE | 04 /
HUELSDUNK, Philipp Lindenstrasse 73 10969 Berlin / DE | 05 /
IDSTEIN, Paul Schulstrase 7 64385 Reichelsheim / DE | 06 /
LEIGSNERING, Michael Drosselweg 11a 64367 Muhltal / DE | 07 /
SUKHANOV, Sergey Robert-Bosch-Strasse 4 64293 Darmstadt / DE | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Taor, Simon Edward William, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20859085.1 | 26.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020IL50932 | Priority number, date | US201962891515P | 26.08.2019 Original published format: US 201962891515 P | [2022/27] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021038565 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022569 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 04.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G06T7/246, G06T19/00, A63F13/213, A63F13/812, A63F13/655, // A63F13/573, A63F13/577 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A63F13/655 (EP);
G06T7/251 (US);
A63F13/213 (EP);
A63F13/812 (EP);
G06T19/00 (EP);
G06T7/246 (EP);
H04N23/61 (US);
H04N23/951 (US);
A63F13/573 (EP);
A63F13/577 (EP);
G06T2207/10024 (EP);
G06T2207/20084 (EP);
G06T2207/30196 (EP);
G06T2207/30224 (EP);
G06T2207/30241 (EP,US);
G06T2210/21 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | G06T7/20, G06T19/00, A63F13/213 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFOLGUNG DER DYNAMIK UNTER VERWENDUNG EINER COMPUTERISIERTEN VORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | TRACKING DYNAMICS USING A COMPUTERIZED DEVICE | [2022/27] | French: | SUIVI DE LA DYNAMIQUE À L'AIDE D'UN DISPOSITIF INFORMATISÉ | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 20.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 31.08.2024 | 05   M06   Fee paid on   12.09.2024 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US6072504 (SEGEN JAKUB [US]); | [XYI]EP2385497 (STATS LLC [US]); | [Y]US2019005331 (LEE JI WON [KR]); | International search | [A]EP2115699 (LINK NORBERT PROF DR [DE]) [A] 1-34* Entire document *; | [X]EP2385497 (STATS LLC [US]) [X] 1-34 * cameras 10, 15, ball 30, processor 45, 24 *; | [X]US2014002493 (MITCHELL KENNY [GB], et al) [X] 1-34 * processor 500, Fig. 3, physical balls 325 and 330 Intersection point 320, Abstract and 6, 14, 18,20,23,35 * | by applicant | US6072504 | EP2385497 | US2019005331 | - HARINI VEERARAGHAVAN et al., "Switching Kalman Filter-Based Approach for Tracking and Event Detection of Traffic Intersections", Proc. 13th Mediterranean Conf. on Control and Automation |