EP4023311 - PROGRAM, METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING TERMINAL [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states COLOPL, INC. 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 107-0052 / JP | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
BABA, Naruatsu c/o COLOPL, Inc., 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1070052 / JP | 02 /
FUKUSHIGE, Junya c/o COLOPL, Inc., 7-2, Akasaka 9-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 1070052 / JP | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | J A Kemp LLP 80 Turnmill Street London EC1M 5QU / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20859231.1 | 06.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020JP30181 | Priority number, date | JP20190157899 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: JP 2019157899 | [2022/27] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021039346 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4023311 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 23.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63F13/428, A63F13/5252, A63F13/5255, A63F13/533, G06F3/0481, G06F13/00, A63F13/56, A63F13/655, A63F13/86 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
G06F3/013 (EP);
A63F13/533 (KR);
A63F13/5252 (EP,KR,US);
A63F13/323 (EP);
A63F13/428 (EP,KR);
A63F13/52 (EP);
A63F13/5255 (KR,US);
A63F13/5258 (EP,US);
A63F13/56 (EP);
A63F13/65 (EP);
A63F13/655 (EP);
A63F13/847 (EP);
A63F13/86 (EP);
A63F13/92 (EP);
G06F13/00 (KR);
G06F3/011 (EP);
G06F3/012 (EP);
G06F3/0481 (KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | A63F13/428, A63F13/5252, A63F13/5255, A63F13/533, G06F3/0481, G06F13/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | PROGRAMM, VERFAHREN UND INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSENDGERÄT | [2022/27] | English: | PROGRAM, METHOD, AND INFORMATION PROCESSING TERMINAL | [2022/27] | French: | PROGRAMME, PROCÉDÉ D'AFFICHAGE ET TERMINAL DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 17.03.2022 | Translation filed | 17.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 17.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 17.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 17.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 11.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 04.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]US2017011554 (BURBA NATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,8,9 * paragraphs [0012] - [0019] - [0026] , [0041] - [0045]; figure 1 *; | [XI]WO2017019530 (SILVER CURVE GAMES INC [US]) [X] 1-3,8,9 * paragraphs [0023] , [0060] - [0065] - [0108]; figures 1,11a-11b * [I] 4-7; | [Y]US9746933 (BURBA NATHAN [US], et al) [Y] 1,8,9 * column 8, line 48 - column 9, line 30; figure 1 *; | [A]US2018096519 (TOKUBO TODD [US]) [A] 1,8,9* paragraphs [0076] - [0092]; figures 4-5 * | International search | [XY]JP6463535B [X] 1-2,4-5,8-9 * [0012]-[0015], [0030], [0117]-[0129], [0142]-[0143], [0149], [0320]-[0329], 15, 61-63 * [Y] 3-7; | [Y] - Anonymous, "26000 people contacting with each other even in 2D possibility of creation of VR character live "HoloLive, description of the HoloLive app will be released in a few days and the world's first live streaming through smartphone AR will be", PANORA Virtual Reality Japan, (20171210), pages 1 - 11, URL: http://panora.tokyo/46586, XP055794107 [Y] 3-7 * , Hololive, AR Hololive * | [A] - Anonymous, "Next generation AR gravure photo session of ALTERNATIVE GIRLS this weekend will be held inside the ticket gate of Akihabara station", PANORA Virtual Reality Japan, (20171213), pages 1 - 6, URL: http://panora.tokyo/46977, XP055794109 [A] 1-9 | by applicant | JP2012120098 |