EP4022143 - SOUND INSULATING AND THERMAL INSULATING MASONRY WITH AN INSULATION CORE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 05.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Trzaskoma, Malgorzata Ul. Wroclawska 7a/8 01-493 Warszawa / PL | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Lampart, Jerzy Kancelaria Patentowa Ul. Wyzwolenia 1b 42-624 Ossy / PL | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20859418.4 | 30.08.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020PL50059 | Priority number, date | PL20190430997 | 30.08.2019 Original published format: PL 43099719 | [2022/27] | Filing language | PL | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021040550 | Date: | 04.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/09] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4022143 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 04.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | XV | 04.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | E04C1/41, E04C1/40, E04B2/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
E04C1/41 (EP);
E04C1/40 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | SCHALLDÄMMENDES UND WÄRMEDÄMMENDES MAUERWERK MIT EINEM ISOLATIONSKERN | [2022/27] | English: | SOUND INSULATING AND THERMAL INSULATING MASONRY WITH AN INSULATION CORE | [2022/27] | French: | MAÇONNERIE ISOLANTE PHONIQUE ET THERMIQUE DOTÉE D'UNE PARTIE CENTRALE ISOLANTE | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 22.01.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]PL181846B (TRZASKOMA WITOLD [PL], et al) [A] 1-12 * pages 2-3 * * figure - *; | [A]EP1726732 (PRZED PROD HANDLOWO USLUGOWE J [PL]) [A] 1-12* the whole document *; | [A]CN209308260U (SHANDONG TIANYU BUILDING MATERIALS TECH CORP LTD) [A] 1 * figure - * * example - * | International search | [A]EP0094067 (NAEGELE & CO BAU [AT]) [A] 1-15; | [Y]PL181846B (TRZASKOMA WITOLD [PL], et al) [Y] 1-15 * : (abstract, Figs. 3, 5,6) *; | [A]CN101463636 (ZONGRONG YING [CN])[A] 1-15; | [Y]CN209308260U (SHANDONG TIANYU BUILDING MATERIALS TECH CORP LTD) [Y] 1-15 * (abstract, Figs. 1-4) * | by applicant | PL217077 | PL232986 | PL233036 | US4551959 | US5209037 | PL181846B | PL341998 | PL361566 | PL210627B | CN108018983 | CN209308260U |