EP4021004 - MATCHING METHOD, TERMINAL AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 21.09.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states GUANGDONG OPPO MOBILE TELECOMMUNICATIONS CORP., LTD. No. 18 Haibin Road Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
WU, Henggang No. 18, Haibin Road, Wusha, Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523860 / CN | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | Tansini, Elio Fabrizio Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti 17 20158 Milano / IT | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | Fassio, Valeria Bugnion S.p.A. Viale Lancetti, 17 20158 Milano / IT | Application number, filing date | 20859996.9 | 03.08.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN106521 | Priority number, date | CN201910843913 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910843913 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021042926 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4021004 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 08.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N21/845, H04N21/234, H04N5/278, H04N21/233, H04N21/43, G10L15/26, G11B27/031, H04N21/488, H04N21/8549 | [2022/41] | CPC: |
H04N21/233 (EP);
H04N5/278 (EP,CN);
G11B27/031 (US);
G10L15/22 (US);
G10L15/30 (US);
G10L25/57 (US);
H04N21/4307 (EP);
H04N21/4394 (US);
H04N21/4884 (EP,CN);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | H04N21/845, H04N21/234, H04N5/278 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | ANPASSUNGSVERFAHREN, ENDGERÄT UND LESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2022/26] | English: | MATCHING METHOD, TERMINAL AND READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MISE EN CORRESPONDANCE, TERMINAL ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 25.03.2022 | Translation filed | 25.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 25.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 25.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 25.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 27.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 20.09.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | 17.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 23.07.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M02) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2009207305 (FUJITA TAKAHISA [JP], et al); | [Y]US2012010869 (MCCARLEY JEFFREY S [US], et al); | [Y]US2013188923 (HARTLEY CHRISTOPHER ALBERT [US], et al); |