EP4026591 - BICYCLE SIMULATOR [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 02.05.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.08.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 25.09.2024 [2024/39] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Real Design Tech Co., Ltd. 19F, 8, Seongnam-daero 331beon-gil Bundang-gu Seongnam-si, Gyeonggi-do 13558 / KR | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
LEE, Joong Sik 304-204, 51-16, Yeongtong-ro 154beon-gil Yeongtong-gu Suwon-si, Gyeonggi-do 16690 / KR | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20860197.1 | 31.08.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020KR11613 | Priority number, date | KR20190108933 | 03.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190108933 | KR20200001568 | 06.01.2020 Original published format: KR 20200001568 | [2022/28] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021045458 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4026591 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/28] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4026591 | Date: | 25.09.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/39] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.11.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A63B69/16, A63B22/02, A63B71/06, A63B24/00, A63B22/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
A63B71/0622 (EP);
A63B22/0207 (US);
A63B22/0023 (EP);
A63B22/02 (EP);
A63B22/025 (EP);
A63B24/0087 (EP);
A63B69/16 (EP);
A63B2022/002 (EP);
A63B2024/009 (EP,US);
A63B2069/166 (EP,US);
A63B2071/0638 (EP,US);
A63B2220/806 (EP);
A63B2220/807 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | A63B69/16, A63B22/02, A63B71/06, A63B24/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | FAHRRADSIMULATOR | [2022/28] | English: | BICYCLE SIMULATOR | [2022/28] | French: | SIMULATEUR DE BICYCLETTE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 16.03.2022 | Translation filed | 03.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 08.12.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.12.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 03.05.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 26.07.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 26.07.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 26.07.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 17.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 21.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]DE104349 ; | [IY]US5492516 (TROTTER EDWARD E [US]); | CO2019003436 [ ] (UNIV AUTONOMA DE BUCARAMANGA UNAB [CO]); | WO2020208497 [ ] (UNIV AUTONOMA DE BUCARAMANGA UNAB [CO]); | International search | [Y]KR100755787B (CHOI HYUNG YONG [KR]) [Y] 12-13* See paragraphs [0097]-[0099] and figures 8-9. *; | [Y]KR20120117104 (KIM SE JIN [KR]) [Y] 4,6,8,21-22 * See paragraph [0037] and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR101249826B (H & S CO LTD [KR], et al) [Y] 10,18 * See claim 1 and figure 1. *; | [Y]KR20160090003 (SIN WOO M TECH CO LTD [KR]) [Y] 2-13,15-18 * See paragraphs [0033]-[0034] and figure 1. *; | [YX]KR101827306B (LEE JOONG SIK [KR]) [Y] 1-13,15-22 * See paragraphs [0095]-[0111] and figures 1-6. * [X] 14; | [Y]KR20180083078 (JUNG JIN HWA [KR]) [Y] 1-13,19-22 * See paragraphs [0026]-[0060] and figure 1. * |