EP4066494 - AN ENCODER, A DECODER AND CORRESPONDING METHODS OF FLEXIBLE PROFILE CONFIGURATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.09.2022 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 22.12.2023 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SOLOVYEV, Timofey Mikhailovich Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
KARABUTOV, Alexander Alexandrovich Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 03 /
IKONIN, Sergey Yurievich Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 04 /
ALSHINA, Elena Alexandrovna Huawei Technologies Duesseldorf GmbH Riesstr. 25 80992 Munich / DE | 05 /
CHERNYAK, Roman Igorevich Huawei Administration Building, Bantian Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/40] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/40] | Application number, filing date | 20861083.2 | 30.12.2020 | [2022/40] | WO2020RU50405 | Priority number, date | WO2020EP50077 | 03.01.2020 Original published format: PCT/EP2020/050077 | [2022/40] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021045656 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4066494 | Date: | 05.10.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/40] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | RU | 01.07.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 12.12.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04N19/70, // H04N19/61 | [2023/02] | CPC: |
H04N19/70 (EP,KR,US);
H04N19/184 (KR);
H04N19/196 (KR);
H04N19/463 (KR);
H04N19/593 (KR);
H04N19/61 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/40] | H04N19/196, H04N19/463, H04N19/593, H04N19/70 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/40] | Title | German: | CODIERER, DECODIERER UND ENTSPRECHENDES VERFAHREN MIT FLEXIBLER PROFILKONFIGURATION | [2022/40] | English: | AN ENCODER, A DECODER AND CORRESPONDING METHODS OF FLEXIBLE PROFILE CONFIGURATION | [2022/40] | French: | CODEUR, DÉCODEUR ET PROCÉDÉS CORRESPONDANTS DE CONFIGURATION FLEXIBLE DE PROFILS | [2022/40] | Entry into regional phase | 27.06.2022 | National basic fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Search fee paid | 27.06.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 27.06.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 27.06.2022 | Examination requested [2022/40] | 06.07.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.07.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 21.12.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [E]EP4030762 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | International search | [A]US9014494 (ESENLIK SEMIH [DE], et al); | [A]US2016249056 (TSUKUBA TAKESHI [JP], et al); | [X]US2018027246 (LIU SHAN [US], et al) |