EP4024817 - DOMAIN NAME SYSTEM SERVER DETERMINATION METHOD, REQUEST PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 02.09.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 19.06.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | Deletion - Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Fangyuan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
LI, Yan Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20861513.8 | 03.09.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN113140 | Priority number, date | CN201910843948 | 06.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910843948 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021043191 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/10] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024817 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 11.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L67/00, H04L61/4511 | [2022/40] | CPC: |
H04L61/4511 (EP,US);
H04L67/14 (EP);
H04W48/18 (EP);
H04W76/10 (US);
H04W8/26 (CN,US);
H04L2101/659 (EP);
H04L2101/677 (EP);
H04L2101/69 (EP);
H04L61/5007 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H04L29/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BESTIMMUNG EINES DOMÄNENNAMENSYSTEMSERVERS, VERFAHREN UND VORRICHTUNG ZUR ANFORDERUNGSVERARBEITUNG UND SYSTEM | [2022/27] | English: | DOMAIN NAME SYSTEM SERVER DETERMINATION METHOD, REQUEST PROCESSING METHOD AND APPARATUS, AND SYSTEM | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTERMINATION DE SERVEUR DE SYSTÈME DE NOM DE DOMAINE, PROCÉDÉ ET APPAREIL DE TRAITEMENT DE REQUÊTE, ET SYSTÈME | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 06.03.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 06.03.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 16.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 18.10.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 11.12.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 05.04.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 20.06.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 30.08.2024 | Disapproval of the communication of intention to grant the patent by the applicant or resumption of examination proceedings by the EPO | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]EP1509025 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD [KR]); | [A]US2014089523 (ROY MICHEL [CA], et al); | [E]EP3886404 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]); |