EP4025586 - COMBINATION ANTIVIRAL THERAPY FOR MEASLES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 10.06.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 12.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees of Columbia University in the City of New York 412 Low Memorial Library 535 West 116th Street Mail Code 4308 New York, NY 10027 / US | For all designated states Cornell University Center for Technology Licensing at Cornell University (CTL) 395 Pine Tree Road, Suite 310 Ithaca, New York 14850 / US | [2022/28] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
POROTTO, Matteo 235 West 102nd St., No. 5T New York, NY 10025 / US | 02 /
MOSCONA, Anne 201 West 89th St., No. 5F New York, NY 10024 / US | 03 /
ALABI, Christopher 102 Brandywine Drive Ithaca, NY 14850 / US | [2022/28] | Representative(s) | HGF HGF Limited 1 City Walk Leeds LS11 9DX / GB | [2022/28] | Application number, filing date | 20861697.9 | 04.09.2020 | [2022/28] | WO2020US49473 | Priority number, date | US201962895752P | 04.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962895752 P | US202062988286P | 11.03.2020 Original published format: US 202062988286 P | US202063009883P | 14.04.2020 Original published format: US 202063009883 P | [2022/28] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | WO2021046398 | Date: | 11.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/10] | Type: | A2 Application without search report | No.: | EP4025586 | Date: | 13.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 11.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/28] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 08.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 06.12.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K47/54, A61K47/55, A61K39/12, C07K14/005, C07K14/12, C07K19/00, A61P31/12 | [2024/01] | CPC: |
A61K47/543 (EP,IL);
A61K39/21 (US);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL);
A61K39/12 (EP,IL);
A61K39/165 (US);
A61K47/55 (EP,IL);
A61P31/14 (US);
A61P31/18 (US);
C07K14/005 (EP,IL);
A61K2039/6075 (US);
A61K2039/6093 (US);
C12N2760/18422 (EP,IL);
|
Former IPC [2022/28] | C07K14/005, C07K14/12, C07K19/00, A61K47/60, A61P31/12 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/28] | Title | German: | KOMBINATION VON ANTIVIRALER THERAPIE FÜR MASERN | [2022/28] | English: | COMBINATION ANTIVIRAL THERAPY FOR MEASLES | [2022/28] | French: | POLYTHÉRAPIE ANTIVIRALE CONTRE LA ROUGEOLE | [2022/28] | Entry into regional phase | 29.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 29.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 29.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 29.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/28] | 02.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 02.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 27.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - FIGUEIRA TIAGO N. ET AL, "Structure-Stability-Function Mechanistic Links in the Anti-Measles Virus Action of Tocopherol-Derivatized Peptide Nanoparticles", ACS NANO, US, (20180919), vol. 12, no. 10, doi:10.1021/acsnano.8b01422, ISSN 1936-0851, pages 9855 - 9865, XP093100901 [X] 1-10,12,13 * whole document and in particular the abstract and Figure 5 * [I] 11 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1021/acsnano.8b01422 | [XI] - Figueira Tiago N ET AL, "Supporting Information - Structure-Stability-Function Mechanistic Links in the Anti-Measles Virus Action of Tocopherol-Derivatized Peptide Nanoparticles", ACS Nano, 12, 10, 9855-9865, (20180919), pages S1 - S10, URL: https://pubs.acs.org/doi/suppl/10.1021/acsnano.8b01422/suppl_file/nn8b01422_si_001.pdf, (20231115), XP093101700 [X] 1-10,12,13 * whole document and in particular page S1 and Figure S1 * [I] 11 | [I] - MATHIEU CYRILLE ET AL, "Broad spectrum antiviral activity for paramyxoviruses is modulated by biophysical properties of fusion inhibitory peptides", SCIENTIFIC REPORTS, vol. 7, doi:10.1038/srep43610, (20170308), page 43610, URL: https://www.nature.com/articles/srep43610.pdf, XP093101485 [I] 1-13 * whole document and in particular Figure 1 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1038/srep43610 | [I] - WATANABE SHUMPEI ET AL, "Mutant Fusion Proteins with Enhanced Fusion Activity Promote Measles Virus Spread in Human Neuronal Cells and Brains of Suckling Hamsters", JOURNAL OF VIROLOGY, US, vol. 87, no. 5, doi:10.1128/JVI.02632-12, ISSN 0022-538X, (20121219), pages 2648 - 2659, URL: https://www.ncbi.nlm.nih.gov/pmc/articles/PMC3571373/pdf/zjv2648.pdf, XP093101813 [I] 14,15 * the whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1128/JVI.02632-12 | International search | [Y]US2013196903 (PESSI ANTONELLO [IT]) [Y] 15, 16* para [0105], [0520], sheet 13 fig 16. *; | [Y]EP2261378 (UNIV TULANE [US], et al) [Y] 1-16, 32, 33 * claim 1. *; | [Y]US2017216448 (POROTTO MATTEO [US], et al) [Y] 1-16, 32, 33 * para [0007], [0015], [0016], [0023], [0033], [0125], [0138], sheet 4 fig 5, sheet 7 fig 9, claims 1, 14, 15 * |