Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021043252 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN104663 | 06.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021042360 | Global Dossier | 11.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2019CN104663 | 06.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022400437 | Global Dossier | 15.12.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN113439 | 04.09.2020 | WO2019CN104663 | 06.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114342488 | Global Dossier | 12.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN113439 | 04.09.2020 | WO2019CN104663 | 06.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4026370 | Global Dossier | 10.01.2024 | A4 | EP4026370 | 13.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020CN113439 | 04.09.2020 | WO2019CN104663 | 06.09.2019 |