EP4030473 - WIRING CIRCUIT BOARD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 13.01.2023 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.01.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 15.02.2023 [2023/07] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nitto Denko Corporation 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MATSUTOMI, Akihito c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | 02 /
HODONO, Masayuki c/o NITTO DENKO CORPORATION 1-2, Shimo-hozumi 1-chome Ibaraki-shi, Osaka 567-8680 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Hoffmann Eitle Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartmbB Arabellastraße 30 81925 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20862723.2 | 12.08.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP30723 | Priority number, date | JP20190166948 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019166948 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049242 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030473 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | H01L23/00, H05K9/00, H05K1/02, H05K1/03, H05K3/28 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
H05K1/0218 (EP,US);
H05K1/024 (EP,CN,KR);
H05K3/305 (US);
H05K1/0219 (KR);
H05K1/0272 (US);
H05K3/308 (US);
H05K9/0026 (EP);
H01B11/18 (CN);
H01L23/66 (KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | LEITERPLATTE | [2022/29] | English: | WIRING CIRCUIT BOARD | [2022/29] | French: | CARTE DE CIRCUIT IMPRIMÉ À CÂBLAGE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.03.2022 | Translation filed | 11.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 11.01.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/07] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 17.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]JPS6255992 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-7 * 2 1-3 2, 1 *; | [Y]JP2002118339 (SONY CHEMICALS) [Y] 1-7 * [0033]-[0045], 2(i) *; | [Y]JP2003201362 (HITACHI LTD, et al) [Y] 5 * [0021] *; | [Y]WO2004060660 (NEC CORP [JP], et al) [Y] 5* 15 13-15 *; | [Y]JP2009146694 (SUMITOMO ELECTRIC INDUSTRIES) [Y] 1-7 * [0005], [0012], 1, 5 * | by applicant | JP2014022146 | WO2018186486 |