EP4029620 - PRESS BRAKE DIE MIS-INSTALLATION DETECTING DEVICE, AND DIE MIS-INSTALLATION DETECTING METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 06.02.2024 | ||
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 23.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.04.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 29.05.2024 [2024/22] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Amada Co., Ltd. 200, Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SENBA, Akira 200, Ishida Isehara-shi, Kanagawa 259-1196 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Grünecker Patent- und Rechtsanwälte PartG mbB Leopoldstraße 4 80802 München / DE | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20862735.6 | 31.08.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP32864 | Priority number, date | JP20190166132 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019166132 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049349 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029620 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4029620 | Date: | 29.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/22] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | B21D5/00, B21D37/00, G05B19/4061, B21D5/02 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
B21D5/0254 (EP);
B21D5/004 (EP);
G05B19/4061 (EP);
G05B2219/35316 (EP);
G05B2219/49153 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | B21D5/02, B21D37/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | VORRICHTUNG ZUR ERKENNUNG DER FEHLMONTAGE EINES GESENKS EINER ABKANTPRESSE UND VERFAHREN ZUR ERKENNUNG DER FEHLMONTAGE EINES GESENKS EINER ABKANTPRESSE | [2022/29] | English: | PRESS BRAKE DIE MIS-INSTALLATION DETECTING DEVICE, AND DIE MIS-INSTALLATION DETECTING METHOD | [2022/29] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE DÉTECTION DE MAUVAISE INSTALLATION DE MATRICE DE PRESSE PLIEUSE, ET PROCÉDÉ DE DÉTECTION DE DE MAUVAISE INSTALLATION DE MATRICE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 10.03.2022 | Translation filed | 10.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 10.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 10.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 10.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 08.05.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.05.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 26.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 07.09.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | 07.02.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 19.04.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 19.04.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 19.04.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 10.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 25.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2001016805 (GUPTA SATYANDRA KUMAR [US], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 11-17 * * claim 1 ** paragraph [0132] - paragraph [0139] *; | [X]US2004157715 (AKAMI ICHIO [JP], et al) [X] 1-8 * figures 41-44 * * paragraph [0221] - paragraph [0228] * * paragraph [0245] - paragraph [0248] * * paragraph [0290] - paragraph [0294] * * paragraph [0305] * | International search | [Y]JP2007061879 (AMADA CO LTD) [Y] 1 - 8 * 0 0 3 2 - 0 0 9 1, 1 - 6 *; | [Y]JP2014024118 (AMADA CO LTD) [Y] 1 - 8* 0 1 6 5 - 0 1 8 9, 1 9 * | by applicant | JP2013173172 | JP2014024118 | JP2019166132 |