EP4029842 - GLASS FILLER AND RESIN COMPOSITION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application has been withdrawn Status updated on 28.07.2023 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.07.2023 | Withdrawal of application | published on 30.08.2023 [2023/35] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states NIPPON SHEET GLASS COMPANY, LIMITED 5-27, Mita 3-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
KATO Shinichi c/o Nippon Sheet Glass Company, Limited 5-27, Mita 3-chome, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-6321 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Cabinet Beau de Loménie 158, rue de l'Université 75340 Paris Cedex 07 / FR | [2022/29] | Application number, filing date | 20863173.9 | 01.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP33033 | Priority number, date | JP20190167629 | 13.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019167629 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049369 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029842 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C03C25/26, C03C13/00, C03C25/326, C03C25/36, C03C25/40, C08K3/40, C08K7/14, C08K9/06, C08L63/00, C08L67/00, C08L67/02, C08L69/00, C08L75/04, C08L77/00, C08L101/00, D06M13/513, D06M15/55, D06M15/564, D06M101/00 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
C08L77/06 (EP,US);
C09D175/04 (EP,US);
C03C25/326 (EP,US);
C03C25/36 (US);
C03C25/40 (US);
C03C25/465 (EP);
C03C3/091 (US);
C08K9/06 (EP);
C08L67/02 (US);
| C-Set: |
C08K9/06, C08L67/02 (EP);
C08K9/06, C08L69/00 (EP);
C08K9/06, C08L77/06 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | GLASFÜLLSTOFF UND HARZZUSAMMENSETZUNG | [2022/29] | English: | GLASS FILLER AND RESIN COMPOSITION | [2022/29] | French: | CHARGE DE VERRE ET COMPOSITION DE RÉSINE | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | Translation filed | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 20.07.2023 | Application withdrawn by applicant [2023/35] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [YA]JP2002047412 (ASAHI KASEI CORP) [Y] 20, 21 * [0 0 0 1 ] - [0 0 0 2], [0 0 3 3] - [0 0 3 4], * [A] 1-19, 22-24; | [YA]JP2003137590 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [Y] 10-12, 15-24 * [0 0 4 3], 1 No. 1 - 4 * [A] 1-9, 13, 14; | [YA]JP2004533557 [Y] 14-24 * [0033]-[0034], 1 5 * [A] 1-13; | [YA]JP2009091176 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD) [Y] 3, 4, 7-24 * [0 0 2 6] * [A] 1, 2, 5, 6; | [A]JP2009263211 (NIPPON ELECTRIC GLASS CO) [A] 1-24; | [XY]JP2014074162 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP) [X] 1, 2, 5, 6, 16-19, 24 * [0 0 0 1 ] - [0 0 02], [0 0 0 5] - [0 0 0 6], [001 0], [0 0 3 3], [0 0 3 7] - [0 0 4 0], [0 0 7 9] - [008 1], [0 0 8 6] - [0 0 9 1 ], 2 18, 21, 24 - 30 * [Y] 3, 4, 7-24; | [A]JP2015203113 (EMS PATENT AG) [A] 1-24; | [YA]WO2017022181 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 3, 4, 7-24 * [0022] - [0 0 2 6], [0 0 4 5], 1 * [A] 1, 2, 5, 6; | [YA]WO2017171101 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 7, 15-24 * [0055] - [0 0 5 6], [0 1 0 1], 1 2 * [A] 1-6, 8-14; | [YA]JP2018035354 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 22, 23 * [0 0 7 8] * [A] 1-21, 24; | [YA]JP2018104529 (TORAY INDUSTRIES) [Y] 22, 23 * [0 0 0 1 ] - [0 0 0 2], [0 0 1 3], * [A] 1-21, 24; | [A]JP2018518440 [A] 1-24; | [YA]WO2018216637 (NIPPON SHEET GLASS CO LTD [JP], et al) [Y] 8-12, 15-24 * [0 1 0 4] - [0 1 0 5], 1 1 - 5 * [A] 1-7, 13, 14; | [YA]WO2019049526 (NITTO BOSEKI CO LTD [JP]) [Y] 13, 15-24 * [0 0 0 1 ], [0 0 0 3], [0009] - [0 0 12], [0 1 3 8], [01 40], [0143], 1 1-4, 6 * [A] 1-12, 14; | [YA]WO2019074038 (TOYO BOSEKI [JP]) [Y] 20, 21 * [0 0 0 1 ] - [0 0 0 2], [0 0 1 8] - [0 0 1 9], * [A] 1-19, 22-24 | by applicant | JPH02124732 | JPH06228806 | JPH0710591 | JPH0718186 | WO2006068255 |