EP4029571 - AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL PESTICIDE HAVING AS ACTIVE COMPONENT CONDENSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND HAVING SUBSTITUTED CYCLOPROPANE OXADIAZOLE GROUP OR SALT THEREOF; ECTOPARASITE OR ENDOPARASITE CONTROL AGENT FOR ANIMALS; AND USE METHOD THEREOF [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 20.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Nihon Nohyaku Co., Ltd. 19-8, Kyobashi 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-8386 / JP | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMAUCHI, Chiaki c/o Research Center, NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 02 /
YONEMURA, Ikki c/o Research Center, NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | 03 /
FUJIHARA, Hirokazu c/o Research Center, NIHON NOHYAKU CO., LTD., 345 Oyamada-cho Kawachinagano-shi, Osaka 586-0094 / JP | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Kraus & Lederer PartGmbB Thomas-Wimmer-Ring 15 80539 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | Lederer & Keller Patentanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Unsöldstraße 2 80538 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20863322.2 | 11.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020JP34387 | Priority number, date | JP20190165792 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019165792 | [2022/29] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021049595 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4029571 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N43/90, A01N43/836, A01P7/02, A01P7/04, C07D413/14, C07D471/04, A61P33/10, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444 | [2023/38] | CPC: |
A61P33/10 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07D471/04 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01N43/82 (EP,CN,US);
A01N43/90 (EP,CN,KR,US);
A01P7/04 (EP);
A61K31/4439 (CN,KR);
|
Former IPC [2022/29] | A61P33/10, C07D413/14, C07D471/04, A01P7/02, A01P7/04, A01P9/00, A01N43/836, A01N43/90, A61K31/4439, A61K31/444 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Title | German: | PESTIZID FÜR LANDWIRTSCHAFT UND GARTENBAU MIT EINER KONDENSIERTEN HETEROCYCLISCHEN VERBINDUNG MIT SUBSTITUIERTER CYCLOPROPAN-OXADIAZOLGRUPPE ODER EINEM SALZ DAVON ALS AKTIVE KOMPONENTE, MITTEL ZUR BEKÄMPFUNG VON EKTOPARASITEN ODER ENDOPARASITEN BEI TIEREN SOWIE VERFAHREN ZUR VERWENDUNG DAVON | [2022/29] | English: | AGRICULTURAL AND HORTICULTURAL PESTICIDE HAVING AS ACTIVE COMPONENT CONDENSED HETEROCYCLIC COMPOUND HAVING SUBSTITUTED CYCLOPROPANE OXADIAZOLE GROUP OR SALT THEREOF; ECTOPARASITE OR ENDOPARASITE CONTROL AGENT FOR ANIMALS; AND USE METHOD THEREOF | [2022/29] | French: | PRODUIT INSECTICIDE AGRICOLE ET HORTICOLE METTANT EN OEUVRE EN TANT QUE PRINCIPE ACTIF UN COMPOSE HETEROCYCLE CONDENSE POSSEDANT UN GROUPE CYCLOPROPANE OXADIAZOLE SUBSTITUE OU DES SELS DE CELUI-CI, AGENT DE LUTTE ANTIPARASITAIRE CONTRE ECTOPARASITES ET ENDOPARASITES CHEZ LES ANIMAUX, AINSI QUE PROCEDES D'UTILISATION DE CEUX-CI | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 08.02.2022 | Translation filed | 08.02.2022 | National basic fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Search fee paid | 08.02.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 08.02.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 08.02.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 27.11.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 27.11.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 19.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]EP2975039 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]WO2016030229 (SYNGENTA PARTICIPATIONS AG [CH]); | [I]EP3421475 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP3421466 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [Y]EP3527560 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) | International search | [XA]WO2017146221 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]); | [A]JP2017526678 ; | [A]JP2019019116 (SUMITOMO CHEMICAL CO); | [A]WO2019059244 (NIHON NOHYAKU CO LTD [JP]) | by applicant | EP0374753 | EP0427529 | EP0451878 | WO9307278 | WO9534656 | WO03052073 | WO2014142292 | WO2016104746 | WO2016121997 | WO2017065183 | WO2017146221 |