EP4027814 - ARTICLES AND FORMULATIONS FOR SMOKING PRODUCTS AND VAPORIZERS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | No opposition filed within time limit Status updated on 24.05.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | The patent has been granted Status updated on 16.06.2023 | ||
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 20.02.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 17.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 12.07.2024 | Lapse of the patent in a contracting state New state(s): IE | published on 14.08.2024 [2024/33] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Cabbacis LLC Post Office Box 540 Clarence NY 14031 / US | [2022/29] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANDOLFINO, Joseph Post Office Box 540 Clarence New York 14031 / US | [2022/29] | Representative(s) | Page White Farrer Bedford House 21a John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2023/29] | Judge, Samuel David, et al Page White & Farrer Services Bedford House 21A John Street London WC1N 2BF / GB | ||
Former [2022/29] | Judge, Samuel David, et al Page White & Farrer Bedford House John Street GB-London WC1N 2BF / GB | Application number, filing date | 20863857.7 | 10.09.2020 | [2022/29] | WO2020US50128 | Priority number, date | US201916569318 | 12.09.2019 Original published format: US201916569318 | [2022/29] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021050682 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4027814 | Date: | 20.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/29] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP4027814 | Date: | 19.07.2023 | Language: | EN | [2023/29] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 05.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | A24B13/00, C12N15/82, A01H1/02 | [2022/29] | CPC: |
A24B15/16 (EP,KR);
A24B15/243 (KR);
A24B15/302 (EP,KR);
A24B15/303 (KR);
A24B15/38 (KR);
A24B15/385 (EP);
A24B15/40 (KR);
A24D1/002 (EP);
A24D1/02 (EP,KR);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/29] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | ARTIKEL UND FORMULIERUNGENFÜR RAUCHWAREN UND VERDAMPFER | [2022/29] | English: | ARTICLES AND FORMULATIONS FOR SMOKING PRODUCTS AND VAPORIZERS | [2022/29] | French: | ARTICLES ET FORMULATIONS POUR PRODUITS À FUMER ET VAPOTEUSES | [2022/29] | Entry into regional phase | 11.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 11.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 11.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 11.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/29] | 23.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 23.11.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 21.02.2023 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 08.06.2023 | Fee for grant paid | 08.06.2023 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 08.06.2023 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Opposition(s) | 22.04.2024 | No opposition filed within time limit [2024/26] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.04.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Lapses during opposition Tooltip | CZ | 19.07.2023 | HR | 19.07.2023 | MC | 19.07.2023 | PL | 19.07.2023 | RO | 19.07.2023 | RS | 19.07.2023 | SK | 19.07.2023 | SM | 19.07.2023 | IE | 10.09.2023 | NO | 19.10.2023 | GR | 20.10.2023 | IS | 19.11.2023 | [2024/33] |
Former [2024/28] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
MC | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/23] | CZ | 19.07.2023 | |
HR | 19.07.2023 | ||
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RO | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SK | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/20] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
SM | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/10] | HR | 19.07.2023 | |
PL | 19.07.2023 | ||
RS | 19.07.2023 | ||
NO | 19.10.2023 | ||
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/09] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | ||
IS | 19.11.2023 | ||
Former [2024/08] | NO | 19.10.2023 | |
GR | 20.10.2023 | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US4676259 (ELLIS MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-10* claims 1-7 *; | [A]US2008230088 (GUO SHUN [CN]) [A] 1-10 * the whole document *; | [A]US8251060 (WHITE JACKIE L [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * column 1, line 63 - column 3, line 15 * * claims 1,11 *; | [A]US8739788 (YOMTOV AMIR [US]) [A] 1-10 * claims 1-8 *; | [A]WO2015009500 (WILLIAMS JONNIE R [US]) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0003] , [0023] , [0042] * * claims 1,2,10,15 *; | [A]US2019001087 (DAVIDSON PERRY [IL], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] - [0005] - [0013] , [0021] , [0083] , [0086] , [0128] , [0221] , [0231] , [0236] , [0254] *; | [A]US2019158938 (BOWEN ADAM [US], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraphs [0002] , [0007] - [0008] - [0122] , [ 177] , [ 210] *; | [A]WO2019159170 (SYQE MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [A] 1-10 * page 2, lines 9-32 * * page 3, lines 1-22 * * page 9, lines 3-15 * * page 24, lines 4-13 * * page 55, line 10 - page 56, line 10 * * claims 1-7,8,14 *; | [AP]US2020051455 (PANDOLFINO JOSEPH [US]) [AP] 1-10 * paragraphs [0006] , [0040] - [0071] - [0172] , [0176] - [0186] * | International search | [A]US4676259 (ELLIS MICHAEL P [US], et al) [A] 1-13* col 1, In 5-6, col 2, In 39-44, col 3, In 59 -61 *; | [A]US2008230088 (GUO SHUN [CN]) [A] 1-13 * para [0004] *; | [A]US8251060 (WHITE JACKIE L [US], et al) [A] 3 * col 12, In 12-13 *; | [A]US8739788 (YOMTOV AMIR [US]) [A] 1-13 * col 1, In 16-24 *; | [A]WO2015009500 (WILLIAMS JONNIE R [US]) [A] 6 * para [0004] *; | [Y]US2019001087 (DAVIDSON PERRY [IL], et al) [Y] 6-9 * para [0003], para [0011], para [0128] *; | [Y]US2019158938 (BOWEN ADAM [US], et al) [Y] 3 * para [0026], para [0210] *; | [XY]WO2019159170 (SYQE MEDICAL LTD [IL]) [X] 1-2, 4-5, 10-13 * pg 2, In 9-32, pg 3, In *14-20, pg 9, In 8-12, pg 11, In 31-33, pg 23, In 17-29, pg 25, In 25-27, pg 32, In 2-4, pg 37, In 4-9, pg 43, In 16-18 * [Y] 3,6-9; | [PX]US2020051455 (PANDOLFINO JOSEPH [US]) [PX] 1-13 * entire document * | by applicant | US3612066 | US4270552 | US5724998 | US7700368 | US8846409 | US9556142 | US9587212 | US9738622 | US9814258 | US10113174 | US10369178 | - The Journal of the American Medical Association | - JAMA, (20180904), vol. 320, no. 9, pages 880 - 891 | - HATSUKAMI et al., Addiction, (20100000), vol. 105, no. 2, pages 343 - 55 | - ARMITAGE et al., Psychopharmacology, (19980000), vol. 96, pages 447 - 453 | - FAGERSTROM, Pharmacology, (19820000), vol. 77, pages 164 - 167 | - SISSON et al., Beitragezur Tabakforschung International, (19900600), vol. 14, no. 6 | - Production, Chemistry and Technology, (19990000), pages 377 - 379 | - ZHANG et al., Rapid Commun Mass Spectrom, (20180000), vol. 32, pages 1791 - 1798 | - LISKO et al., Anal Chem., (20130319), vol. 85, no. 6, pages 3380 - 3384 | - AYERS et al., The AAPS Journal, vol. 7, no. 3, (20050000), pages E752 - E758, URL: http://www.aapsj.org |