EP3957119 - DYNAMIC SPECTRUM SHARING BETWEEN COVERAGE TYPES [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 21.01.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 20.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 02.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Aalyria Technologies, Inc. 41491 Carriage Horse Drive Aldie, Virginia 20105 / US | [2022/47] |
Former [2022/08] | For all designated states Google LLC 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ANANTH, Sharath 1600 Amphitheatre Parkway Mountain View, CA 94043 / US | [2022/08] | Representative(s) | Anderson, Oliver Ben, et al Venner Shipley LLP 200 Aldersgate London EC1A 4HD / GB | [2022/08] | Application number, filing date | 20864002.9 | 14.09.2020 | [2022/08] | WO2020US50667 | Priority number, date | US201962900090P | 13.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962900090 P | US202017018542 | 11.09.2020 Original published format: US202017018542 | [2022/08] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021051055 | Date: | 18.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/11] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3957119 | Date: | 23.02.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 18.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/08] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 18.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 21.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | H04W72/0446, H04W16/14, H04B7/185, H04W72/0453, // H04W84/06 | [2023/34] | CPC: |
H04W72/0453 (EP,CN,US);
H04W16/14 (EP,CN,US);
H04B7/18504 (EP,CN);
H04W24/02 (CN,US);
H04W72/0446 (EP,CN);
H04W72/12 (CN,US);
H04W84/06 (EP,CN)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/08] | H04W72/04, H04W16/14, H04W84/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/08] | Title | German: | DYNAMISCHE SPEKTRUMSTEILUNG ZWISCHEN ABDECKUNGSTYPEN | [2022/08] | English: | DYNAMIC SPECTRUM SHARING BETWEEN COVERAGE TYPES | [2022/08] | French: | PARTAGE DYNAMIQUE DE SPECTRE ENTRE DES TYPES DE COUVERTURE | [2022/08] | Entry into regional phase | 15.11.2021 | National basic fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Search fee paid | 15.11.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.11.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.11.2021 | Examination requested [2022/08] | 07.06.2022 | Loss of particular rights, legal effect: Claims | 29.06.2022 | Despatch of communication of loss of particular rights: Claims {1} | 19.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 30.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2018121208 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [P]EP3557780 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [P] * paragraphs [0034] - [0036] - [0 39] - [0058]; figure 5 *; | [AP]WO2020030713 (SONY CORP [JP], et al) [AP] 1-15* page 13 lines 25-28, fig 5 step 650, page 16 lines 3-10, page 17 lines 1-36 *; | [Y] - NOKIA (EMAIL DISCUSSION RAPPORTEUR), "Report of Email Discussion [106#72] [NR/NTN] TP on NTN-TN Service continuity", vol. RAN WG2, no. Prague, CZ; 20190826 - 20190830, (20190816), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1910692 REPORT OF EMAIL DISCUSSION 106#72 NR-NTN TP ON NTN-TN SERVICE CONTINUITY (NOKIA), 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ;, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/tsg_ran/WG2_RL2/TSGR2_107/Docs/R2-1910692.zip, (20190816), XP051768463 [Y] 1-15 * section 4 * | International search | [Y]US2008287124 (KARABINIS PETER D [US]) [Y] 6,13,20* paragraph [0048]; and figure 1 *; | [Y]US2012122449 (MONTE PAUL A [US], et al) [Y] 3,5,7,10,12,14,18,19 * paragraphs [0008], [0049]; claim 7; and figure 1 *; | [Y]US2016037434 (GOPAL RAJEEV [US], et al) [Y] 1-20 * paragraphs [0011], [0044]-[0081]; and figures 2A-3 *; | [Y]US2017202025 (OUCHI WATARU [JP], et al) [Y] 4,11 * paragraph [0047] *; | [Y]WO2018121208 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD [CN]) [Y] 1-20 * claim 1; and figure 5 * |