EP3858563 - SHAVER HAVING NOVEL ROTATABLE BLADE NET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.06.2023 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 02.07.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 11.06.2021 | ||
Former | unknown Status updated on 24.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 16.02.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 20.03.2024 [2024/12] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Wang, Rui 3 West of Industrial Rd, Xichong Industrial Park Lunjiao Shunde Foshan, Guangdong 528300 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | For all designated states Wang, Rui 3 West of Industrial Rd, Xichong Industrial Park Lunjiao, Shunde Foshan Guangdong 528300 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2021/31] | Representative(s) | Ipside 7-9 Allée Haussmann 33300 Bordeaux Cedex / FR | [N/P] |
Former [2021/31] | Monteiro Alves, Inês Alameda Dos Oceanos, Nº 41K-21 Parque das Nações 1990-207 Lisboa / PT | Application number, filing date | 20864284.3 | 03.04.2020 | [2021/31] | WO2020CN83108 | Priority number, date | CN201911213337 | 02.12.2019 Original published format: CN201911213337 | [2021/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021109379 | Date: | 10.06.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/23] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3858563 | Date: | 04.08.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 10.06.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2021 | Classification | IPC: | B26B19/14, B26B19/28 | [2021/46] | CPC: |
B26B19/145 (EP);
B26B19/14 (EP,CN);
B26B19/143 (EP);
B26B19/28 (EP);
B26B19/38 (CN);
B26B19/3846 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2021/31] | B26B19/14, B26B19/38 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/31] | Title | German: | NEUARTIGES ROTIERENDES KLINKENNETZ EINES RASIERAPPARATS | [2021/31] | English: | SHAVER HAVING NOVEL ROTATABLE BLADE NET | [2021/31] | French: | RASOIR DOTÉ D'UN NOUVEAU FILET DE LAME ROTATIF | [2021/31] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2021 | Translation filed | 24.03.2021 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2021 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2021 | Examination requested [2021/31] | 05.05.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.06.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 03.11.2023 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/12] | 23.11.2023 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/12] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 29.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]US2283834 (DAM ALEXIS VAN, et al) [A] 1-7* the whole document *; | [A]EP0868981 (IZUMI PROD CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US6212776 (IZUMI SHUNJI [JP], et al) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2006065052 (OH TAE JUN [KR]) [A] 1-7 * the whole document *; | [A]US8397388 (STEINBERG HY [US]) [A] 1-7 * column 2, line 21 - column 3, line 3; figures 1, 2 *; | [A]EP3115160 (IZUMI PROD CO [JP]) [A] 1-7 * paragraphs [0011] - [0042]; figures 2-7 * | International search | [PX]CN110788888 (WANG RUI) [PX] 1-7 * claims 1-7 *; | [A]CN108058190 (WENZHOU SHILI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-7 * description, paragraphs [0027]-[0034], and figures 1-15 *; | [A]CN201179659Y (WEIMING CAO [CN]) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]CN101254596 (ZHEJIANG JINDA MOTOR ELECTRIC [CN]) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]CN205466349U (XUE BOQIAN) [A] 1-7 * entire document *; | [A]US9266246 (SCHMITT PAUL ALLEN [US]) [A] 1-7 * entire document * |