EP4032594 - INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 16.02.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Sony Group Corporation 1-7-1, Konan Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHIMADA, Daiki c/o Sony Corporation, 1-7-1, Konan, Minato-ku Tokyo 108-0075 / JP | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | MFG Patentanwälte Meyer-Wildhagen Meggle-Freund Gerhard PartG mbB Amalienstraße 62 80799 München / DE | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20864454.2 | 15.07.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020JP27500 | Priority number, date | JP20190168590 | 17.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019168590 | [2022/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021053949 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032594 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06N3/00, G06N20/00, G10L25/51, H04N5/232 | [2022/46] | CPC: |
G10L25/51 (EP);
B25J13/003 (US);
B25J11/0005 (US);
B25J9/1664 (US);
G06N20/00 (EP);
G06N3/008 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/30] | A63H11/00, G05D1/02, H04N5/232, G06N20/00, G10L15/10, G10L25/51 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVORRICHTUNG, INFORMATIONSVERARBEITUNGSVERFAHREN UND PROGRAMM | [2022/30] | English: | INFORMATION PROCESSING DEVICE, INFORMATION PROCESSING METHOD, AND PROGRAM | [2022/30] | French: | DISPOSITIF DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS, PROCÉDÉ DE TRAITEMENT D'INFORMATIONS ET PROGRAMME | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 02.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 21.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 21.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 19.02.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 13.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 21.07.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 20.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 23.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI] - ZOU QIANG ET AL, "Robotic Path Planning Based on Episodic-cognitive Map", INTERNATIONAL JOURNAL OF CONTROL, AUTOMATION AND SYSTEMS, KOREAN INSTITUTE OF ELECTRICAL ENGINEERS, SEOUL, KR, vol. 17, no. 5, doi:10.1007/S12555-018-0141-7, ISSN 1598-6446, (20190504), pages 1304 - 1313, (20190504), XP036774548 [X] 1,2,7-13 * figures 3, 4, 5 * * sections 2 and 3 * [I] 3-6 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s12555-018-0141-7 | [A] - CHIN WEI HONG ET AL, "Episodic Memory Multimodal Learning for Robot Sensorimotor Map Building and Navigation", IEEE TRANSACTIONS ON COGNITIVE AND DEVELOPMENTAL SYSTEMS, IEEE, vol. 11, no. 2, doi:10.1109/TCDS.2018.2875309, ISSN 2379-8920, (20190601), pages 210 - 220, (20190607), XP011729114 [A] 3-6 * figures 2, 3 * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1109/TCDS.2018.2875309 | International search | [Y]JP2018163293 (SHARP KK) [Y] 2, 4, 6 * , paragraphs [0012]-[0021] *; | [XY]JP2019010728 (GROOVE X INC) [X] 1, 3, 7-13 * , paragraphs [0051]-[0119] * [Y] 2, 4-6; | [A]US2019164218 (MIYAJIMA YASUSHI [JP]) [A] 1-13* , paragraphs [0155], [0156] *; | [Y]JP2019113696 (CASIO COMPUTER CO LTD) [Y] 5, 6 * , paragraphs [0038]-[0042] *; | [XA]WO2019151387 (GROOVE X INC [JP]) [X] 1, 7-13 * , paragraphs [0038], [0072]-[0107], fig. 12 * [A] 2-6 | by applicant | JPH09218955 | WO2014167700 |