EP3920182 - FREQUENCY BAND EXTENSION METHOD, APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 04.08.2023 Database last updated on 16.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 05.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 15.11.2023 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen, Guangdong, 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2022/29] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | ||
Former [2021/49] | For all designated states Tencent Technology (Shenzhen) Company Limited 35/F, Tencent Building Kejizhongyi Road Midwest District of Hi-tech Park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Inventor(s) | 01 /
XIAO, Wei 35/F,Tencent Building, Kejizhongyi Road, Midwest District of Hi-tech park Nanshan District Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | 01 /
XIAO, Wei Shenzhen City, Guangdong 518057 / CN | Representative(s) | AWA Sweden AB Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | [N/P] |
Former [2021/49] | AWA Sweden AB P.O. Box 45086 104 30 Stockholm / SE | Application number, filing date | 20864964.0 | 14.09.2020 | [2021/49] | WO2020CN115052 | Priority number, date | CN201910882478 | 18.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910882478 | [2021/49] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052287 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3920182 | Date: | 08.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/49] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 09.05.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G10L19/02, G10L21/0388, G10L25/30 | [2022/23] | CPC: |
G10L21/0388 (EP,US);
G10L19/02 (CN);
G10L19/0212 (CN,US);
G10L19/0204 (US);
G10L19/0208 (US);
G10L19/0216 (CN);
|
Former IPC [2021/49] | G10L19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/49] | Title | German: | FREQUENZBANDERWEITERUNGSVERFAHREN, EINRICHTUNG, ELEKTRONISCHE VORRICHTUNG UND COMPUTERLESBARES SPEICHERMEDIUM | [2021/49] | English: | FREQUENCY BAND EXTENSION METHOD, APPARATUS, ELECTRONIC DEVICE AND COMPUTER-READABLE STORAGE MEDIUM | [2021/49] | French: | PROCÉDÉ D'EXTENSION DE BANDE DE FRÉQUENCES, APPAREIL, DISPOSITIF ÉLECTRONIQUE ET SUPPORT DE STOCKAGE LISIBLE PAR ORDINATEUR | [2021/49] | Entry into regional phase | 03.09.2021 | Translation filed | 03.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 03.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/49] | 08.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.08.2023 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 15.11.2023 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 16.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US2013144614 (MYLLYLA VILLE MIKAEL [FI], et al) [X] 1,14,15 * abstract ** paragraphs [0019] - [0025] - [0093] - [0135] - [0155] , [0172] - [0205] *; | [XAI]WO2019081070 (FRAUNHOFER GES FORSCHUNG [DE], et al) [X] 1,6,7,9,14,15 * abstract * * page 3 - page 7 * * page 9 - page 14 * [A] 2-5,11-13 [I] 8,10 |