EP4031536 - IDENTIFICATION OF COMPOUNDS THAT INHIBIT STRESS GRANULE FORMATION AND TAU AGGREGATION BY TARGETING TIA1 [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 19.07.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 19.07.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 21.08.2024 [2024/34] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states The Trustees Of Columbia University In The City Of New York 535 West 116th Street 412 Low Memorial Library New York, NY 10027 / US | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
RAYMAN, Joseph, B. 530 W. 113th Street Apt. 2B New York, NY 10025 / US | 02 /
LANDRY, Donald c/o Columbia University 535 West 116th Street 412 Low Memorial Library New York, NY 10027 / US | 03 /
DENG, Shixian c/o Columbia University 650 W. 168th Street, Bb1029 New York, NY 10032 / US | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Berggren Oy P.O. Box 16 Eteläinen Rautatiekatu 10A 00101 Helsinki / FI | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20865295.8 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020US51107 | Priority number, date | US201962900784P | 16.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962900784 P | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021055502 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4031536 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 25.03.2021 | Classification | IPC: | C07D275/04, A61K31/428, A61P25/00, A61K35/00 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A61K31/506 (EP,US);
C07D275/04 (EP,US);
A61K31/403 (EP);
A61K31/428 (EP,US);
A61K31/437 (EP,US);
A61K31/4412 (US);
A61K31/519 (EP,US);
A61K31/5377 (US);
A61K31/69 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | IDENTIFIZIERUNG VON VERBINDUNGEN ZUR HEMMUNG DER BILDUNG VON STRESSGRANULATEN UND TAU-AGGREGATION DURCH DAS TARGETING VON TIA1 | [2022/30] | English: | IDENTIFICATION OF COMPOUNDS THAT INHIBIT STRESS GRANULE FORMATION AND TAU AGGREGATION BY TARGETING TIA1 | [2022/30] | French: | IDENTIFICATION DE COMPOSÉS INHIBANT LA FORMATION DE GRANULES DE STRESS ET L'AGRÉGATION DE PROTÉINES TAU PAR CIBLAGE DE TIA1 | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 14.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 14.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 14.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 14.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 03.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/34] | 24.04.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: renewal fee not paid in time [2024/34] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2022 | 03   M06   Fee paid on   27.01.2023 | 30.09.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [X]WO2008005538 (EXELIXIS INC [US], et al) [X] 1-3 * para [0027], [00105]; pg 58, Table, Entry 519 *; | [A]WO2011062864 (UNIV EMORY [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * pg 14, Table; pg 29, In 18 to pg 30, In 5; claims 12-13 *; | [A]US2017044185 (MA HAICHING [US], et al) [A] 1-3 * para [0123], [0127] *; | [X]WO2017066657 (AQUINNAH PHARMACEUTICALS INC [US], et al) [X] 1 * pg 2, para 1, para 5; pg 6, para 3 *; | [A]WO2019030692 (FRIEDRICH MIESCHER INSTITUTE FOR BIOMEDICAL RES [CH]) [A] 1-3* Entire Document *; | [X] - "2-(3,5-Dimethylphenyl)-1,2-benzothiazol-3-one", PUBCHEM Compound, (20071205), Database accession no. CID22416252, URL: ncbi, XP055808012 [X] 12 * pg 2 * |