EP4041283 - IL-2 CHIMERIC PROTEINS FOR IMMUNOSUPPRESSION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 27.04.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states National Institute for Biotechnology in the Negev Ltd. Bldg. 39 Ben Gurion University of the Negev 8410501 Beer-Sheva / IL | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PORGADOR, Angel 11 Tavlan Street 8533800 Lehavim / IL | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Boult Wade Tennant LLP Salisbury Square House 8 Salisbury Square London EC4Y 8AP / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20865474.9 | 22.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020IL51029 | Priority number, date | US201962903855P | 22.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962903855 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021053681 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041283 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | IL | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 13.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K38/20, A61P37/02, A61P19/02, A61K38/17, C07K14/00, A61P29/00, A61P37/00 | [2023/41] | CPC: |
E03F5/0404 (EP,IL,US);
A61K38/1709 (EP);
A61K38/2013 (EP);
A61P1/00 (US);
A61P19/02 (US);
A61P29/00 (EP);
A61P37/00 (EP);
A61P37/06 (US);
C07K14/55 (EP,US);
C07K14/705 (EP);
E03F5/046 (IL,US);
A61K38/00 (US);
C07K2319/00 (EP);
C07K2319/21 (EP);
C07K2319/31 (US);
C07K2319/50 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A61K38/1709, A61K2300/00 (EP);
A61K38/2013, A61K2300/00 (EP) |
Former IPC [2022/33] | A61K38/20, A61P37/02, A61P19/02 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | CHIMÄRE IL-2 PROTEINE ZUR IMMUNSUPPRESSION | [2022/33] | English: | IL-2 CHIMERIC PROTEINS FOR IMMUNOSUPPRESSION | [2022/33] | French: | PROTÉINES CHIMÉRIQUES D'IL-2 POUR IMMUNOSUPPRESSION | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 08.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 08.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 29.04.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M06) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 07.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 28.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [A]WO2013140393 (YISSUM RES DEV CO [IL], et al) [A] 1-15 * the whole document *; | [A]WO2017201432 (JOUNAIDI YOUSSEF [US], et al) [A] 1-15* the whole document * | International search | [Y]WO2018011803 (NAT INST BIOTECHNOLOGY NEGEV LTD [IL], et al) [Y] 13-18,21,22* SEQ ID NO: 69; description paragraph [0273] *; | [XY] - WARD, N. C. et al., "IL -2/ CD 25: a long-acting fusion protein that promotes immune tolerance by selectively targeting the IL -2 receptor on regulatory T cells", The Journal of Immunology, (20181003), vol. 201, no. 9, doi:10.4049/jimmunol.1800907, pages 2579 - 2592, XP055627515 [X] 1-6,8-12,23,24,28 * whole document whole document, especially page 2590, a para bridging left and right columns * [Y] 7,13-18,21,22 DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.4049/jimmunol.1800907 | [Y] - COOLES, F. A. et al., "Treg cells in rheumatoid arthritis: an update", Current rheumatology reports, (20130915), vol. 15, no. 9, XP055808707 [Y] 7 * electronic version, page 5, a para before last - page 7, 2nd para * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1007/s11926-013-0352-0 | [Y] - BELL, C. J. et al., "Sustained in vivo signaling by long-lived IL -2 induces prolonged increases of regulatory T cells", Journal of autoimmunity, (20150131), vol. 56, pages 66 - 80, XP029125822 [Y] 13-18,21,22 * whole document * DOI: http://dx.doi.org/10.1016/j.jaut.2014.10.002 |