EP4013768 - COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY PROTEIN PRECIPITATION [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 03.07.2024 Database last updated on 17.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 20.05.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 03.07.2024 | New entry: Communication of intention to grant a patent | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Plasma Technologies, LLC 36 Prioleau St. Charleston, South Carolina 29401 / US | [2022/25] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZURLO, Eugene 36 Prioleau Street Charleston, South Carolina 29401 / US | 02 /
CURTIN, Dennis 22 Spitfire Drive Plattsburgh, New York 12901 / US | 03 /
RADTKE, Peter 36 Prioleau Street Charleston, South Carolina 29401 / US | 04 /
BRILLHART, Kurt L. 26841 Via Alcala Mission Viejo, California 92691 / US | [2022/25] | Representative(s) | FRKelly Waterways House Grand Canal Quay Dublin D02 PD39 / IE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/25] | FRKelly 27 Clyde Road Dublin D04 F838 / IE | Application number, filing date | 20865571.2 | 10.01.2020 | [2022/25] | WO2020US12961 | Priority number, date | US201962903644P | 20.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962903644 P | [2022/25] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054998 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4013768 | Date: | 22.06.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/25] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07K1/30, C07K1/14, C07K1/16, C07K1/34, B01D15/08, G01N33/49 | [2024/25] | CPC: |
C07K1/303 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K1/18 (CN,US);
C07K1/30 (EP,CN,US);
C07K1/34 (EP,CN,KR,US);
C07K1/36 (CN,US);
G01N1/40 (US);
G01N1/4055 (US);
G01N30/06 (CN,US);
G01N30/12 (CN,US);
G01N33/491 (EP,CN,US);
B01D15/08 (EP);
B01D15/361 (US);
B01D15/38 (US)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2023/34] | C07K1/30, C07K1/14, C07K1/16, C07K1/34, B01D15/08 | ||
Former IPC [2022/25] | C07K1/30, C07K1/14, C07K1/16 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/25] | Title | German: | ZUSAMMENSETZUNGEN UND VERFAHREN ZUR HOCHEFFIZIENTEN PROTEINFÄLLUNG | [2022/25] | English: | COMPOSITIONS AND METHODS FOR HIGH EFFICIENCY PROTEIN PRECIPITATION | [2022/25] | French: | COMPOSITIONS ET PROCÉDÉS DE PRÉCIPITATION DE PROTÉINES À HAUT RENDEMENT | [2022/25] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/25] | 26.09.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 30.01.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 04.07.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 15.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.01.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 09.01.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [A]US4814435 (SCHWARZ OTTO [AT], et al); | [A]US2006223988 (MAURER GERALD L [US]); | [A]US8063189 (ARUNAKUMARI ALAHARI [US], et al); | [A]US9624262 (VAN ALSTINE JAMES [SE], et al); |