EP4030904 - STICKER FORMULATION CONTAINING A SULFOPOLYMER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 18.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 26.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Eastman Chemical Company 200 South Wilcox Drive Kingsport, TN 37660 / US | [2022/30] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PONASIK, James, Allen, Jr. 5401 Canova Court Kingsport, TN 37664 / US | 02 /
DOS SANTOS, Ana, Margarida Ledebaan 283 9300 Aalst / BE | 03 /
DELOACH, Joseph, Alexander 150 Ingle Road Jonesborough, TN 37659 / US | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstraße 5-7 80331 München / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/30] | Ricker, Mathias Wallinger Ricker Schlotter Tostmann Patent- und Rechtsanwälte Partnerschaft mbB Zweibrückenstrasse 5-7 80331 München / DE | Application number, filing date | 20865576.1 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020US50814 | Priority number, date | US201962900716P | 16.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962900716 P | US201962900722P | 16.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962900722 P | [2022/30] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021055318 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4030904 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 25.03.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A01N25/04, A01N59/16, A01N65/06, C05G5/27, C08L67/00, C08G63/688, C08G63/91, C08G69/44 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
A01N25/24 (EP,US);
A01N25/30 (EP);
C05G3/30 (EP);
C05G3/40 (US);
C05G3/44 (EP);
C05G3/50 (EP);
C05G5/27 (EP);
C08G63/688 (EP);
C08G69/42 (EP);
C08G69/44 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
A01N25/24, A01N31/08, A01N37/40, A01N47/04, A01N47/14, A01N47/24, A01N47/26 (EP);
A01N25/30, A01N31/08, A01N37/40, A01N47/04, A01N47/14, A01N47/24, A01N47/26 (EP) | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | EIN SULFOPOLYMER ENTHALTENDE STICKERFORMULIERUNG | [2022/30] | English: | STICKER FORMULATION CONTAINING A SULFOPOLYMER | [2022/30] | French: | FORMULATION D'ADHÉSIF CONTENANT UN SULFOPOLYMÈRE | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 15.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 15.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 15.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 15.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 12.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 12.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 09.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 12.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 12.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [X]US4719009 (FUREY JAMES T [CA], et al) [X] 1-6,15 * claims 1-9 * * example 1 *; | [XI]FR2791906 (RHODIA CHIMIE SA [FR]) [X] 1-7,9-13,15 * claims 1-48 * * page 2, lines 25-29 * * examples 1-2 * [I] 1-15; | [XI]WO0194002 (SYNGENTA LTD [GB]) [X] 1-7,9-13,15 * claim 9 * * page 9, line 22 - page 10, line 6 * * page 20, lines 11-13 * * page 19, lines 20-23 * * page 27, line 13 - page 28, line 21 * [I] 1-15; | [X]WO0243489 (AVON PROD INC [US], et al) [X] 1-6,15 * claims 1-37 * * page 12, paragraph 16; table 1 *; | [XI]WO03075659 (SUMITOMO CHEM TAKEDA AGRO CO [JP], et al) [X] 1-7,9-13,15 * claims 1-9 * * formulation examples 1-14 * * experiments 1-8 * [I] 1-15; | [X]JP2005002198 (TOYO BOSEKI) [X] 1-6,15 * examples a, 1, 2 * * table 1 * * claims 1-2 *; | [XI]US6916481 (PRUD HOMME CHRISTIAN [FR], et al) [X] 1-13,15 * claims 1-31 * * example 9 * [I] 1-15; | [X]US2007275191 (HALAHMI IZHAR [IL]) [X] 1-6,15 * paragraphs [0083] - [0092] *; | [X]US2009163449 (WEMPE MICHAEL FITZPATRICK [US]) [X] 1-15 * paragraphs [0037] , [0055] - [0066] * * claims 1-22 *; | [XI]CN101712754 (CHANGXING DEYUAN ENVIRONMENTAL, et al) [X] 1-7,9-13,15 * claims 1-10 * * examples 1-5 * * table 1 * [I] 1-15; | [I]US2014018240 (CROSBY KEVIN E [US], et al) [I] 6,10,15 * claims 1-15 *; | [X]DE102016206831 (XEROX CORP [US]) [X] 1-6,15 * claim 4 ** example 1 *; | [XI]CN107410296 (GUANGDONG GEOLONG BIOTECHNOLOGY CO LTD) [X] 1-7,9-13,15 * claim 6 * * tables 1-3 * * paragraph [0010] * [I] 1-15; | [X]CN109627960 (JIAXING QINGHE GAOLI INSULATION MAT CO LTD) [X] 1-6,15 * claims 1,2 *; | [X]CN109942777 (ANHUI MINGSHIDA NEW MAT CO LTD) [X] 1-6,15 * claim 5 * * abstract * | International search | [A]WO8706575 (EXXON RESEARCH ENGINEERING CO [US]) [A] 1-7,24-26,46-48; | [A]WO8903638 (EXXON CHEMICAL PATENTS INC [US]) [A] 1-7,24-26,46-48; | [A]US5543488 (MILLER RICHARD A [US], et al)[A] 1-7,24-26,46-48; | [Y]US6162890 (GEORGE SCOTT ELLERY [US], et al) [Y] 1-7,24-26,46-48; | [Y]WO2009120182 (EASTMAN CHEM CO [US]) [Y] 1-7,24-26,46-48 |