EP4024941 - QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE MEASUREMENT METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 09.05.2024 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 28.06.2024 | New entry: Reply to examination report | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
HU, Xingxing Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | 02 /
ZHANG, Hongping Huawei Administration Building Bantian, Longgang Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Goddar, Heinz J. Boehmert & Boehmert Anwaltspartnerschaft mbB Pettenkoferstrasse 22 80336 München / DE | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20866014.2 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN115307 | Priority number, date | CN201910877618 | 17.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910877618 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021052321 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024941 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.08.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W24/02 | [2022/27] | CPC: |
H04L41/0806 (EP);
H04W24/02 (EP,CN,US);
H04L43/55 (CN,US);
H04W24/10 (EP,CN);
H04L41/5067 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUM MESSEN DER ERFAHRUNGSQUALITÄT UND KOMMUNIKATIONSGERÄT | [2022/27] | English: | QUALITY OF EXPERIENCE MEASUREMENT METHOD AND COMMUNICATION APPARATUS | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE MESURE DE QUALITÉ D'EXPÉRIENCE ET APPAREIL DE COMMUNICATION | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 14.12.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 14.12.2022 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 08.05.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 27.06.2024 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 26.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XY]US2012311126 (JADALLAH ANAS [CA], et al) [X] 1,3,9 * paragraph [0001] * * paragraph [0017] * * paragraph [0018] * * paragraph [0022] * * paragraph [0076] * [Y] 2,4,5; | [X]US2016050124 (SANCHEZ VEGA VERONICA [ES], et al) [X] 1,9 * paragraph [0036] * * paragraph [0042] * * paragraph [0056] *; | [A]US2018376394 (HAHN GENEBECK [KR], et al) [A] 1-10 * paragraph [0334] - paragraph [0339]; table 2 *; | [XY] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Introduction of QoE Measurement Collection for streaming services", vol. RAN WG2, no. Athens, Greece; 20170213 - 20170217, (20170305), 3GPP DRAFT; 25300_CR0054R1_(REL-14)_R2-1702254, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings_3GPP_SYNC/RAN/Docs/, (20170305), XP051231970 [X] 6-8,10 * page 3, line 17 * * page 3, line 18 - line 19 * * page 3, line 11 - line 12 * * page 3, line 7 - line 9 * * page 3, line 21 - line 22 * [Y] 2,4,5 | [A] - ERICSSON, "QoE Measurement Collection in NR", vol. RAN WG2, no. Reno, US; 20190513 - 20190517, (20190513), 3GPP DRAFT; R2-1906232 - QOE MEASUREMENT COLLECTION IN NR, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-ANTIPOLIS CEDEX ; FRANCE, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/RAN2/Docs/R2%2D1906232%2Ezip, (20190513), XP051729702 [A] 1-10 * paragraph [02.1] * |