EP3929754 - BATTERY MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The patent has been granted Status updated on 29.03.2024 Database last updated on 06.07.2024 | |
Former | Grant of patent is intended Status updated on 10.01.2024 | ||
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 26.11.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | (Expected) grant | published on 01.05.2024 [2024/18] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | [2024/18] |
Former [2022/13] | For all designated states LG Energy Solution, Ltd. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | ||
Former [2021/52] | For all designated states LG ENERGY SOLUTION, LTD. Tower 1, 108, Yeoui-daero Yeongdeungpo-gu Seoul 07335 / KR | Inventor(s) | 01 /
CHOI, Jae-Yeon LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | 02 /
BAEK, Jong-Shik LG Chem Research Park, 188, Munji-ro, Yuseong-Gu Daejeon 34122 / KR | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/52] | 01 /
CHOI, Jae-Yeon Daejeon 34122 / KR | ||
02 /
BAEK, Jong-Shik Daejeon 34122 / KR | Representative(s) | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | [2024/18] |
Former [2021/52] | Plasseraud IP 66, rue de la Chaussée d'Antin 75440 Paris Cedex 09 / FR | Application number, filing date | 20866055.5 | 17.09.2020 | [2021/52] | WO2020KR12583 | Priority number, date | KR20190116253 | 20.09.2019 Original published format: KR 20190116253 | [2021/52] | Filing language | KO | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054749 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | KO | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3929754 | Date: | 29.12.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/52] | Type: | B1 Patent specification | No.: | EP3929754 | Date: | 01.05.2024 | Language: | EN | [2024/18] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | KR | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | G06F12/0815, G06F12/0882, G06F12/0891, G06F12/109, G06F12/14, H02J7/00 | [2021/52] | CPC: |
H02J7/0047 (EP);
G06F12/0815 (EP,KR,US);
G06F1/26 (CN);
G06F12/0808 (US);
G06F12/084 (US);
G06F12/0842 (CN);
G06F12/0877 (CN);
G06F12/0882 (KR);
G06F12/0891 (KR);
G06F12/109 (KR);
G06F12/1433 (US);
G06F12/1458 (KR);
G06F3/0637 (CN);
G06F9/4405 (CN);
G06F9/526 (EP);
H02J7/00 (KR);
H02J7/0048 (EP,US);
H02J7/005 (EP,US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/52] | Extension states | BA | Not yet paid | ME | Not yet paid | Validation states | KH | Not yet paid | MA | Not yet paid | MD | Not yet paid | TN | Not yet paid | Title | German: | BATTERIEVERWALTUNGSVORRICHTUNG UND -VERFAHREN | [2021/52] | English: | BATTERY MANAGEMENT APPARATUS AND METHOD | [2021/52] | French: | APPAREIL ET PROCÉDÉ DE GESTION DE BATTERIE | [2021/52] | Entry into regional phase | 23.09.2021 | Translation filed | 23.09.2021 | National basic fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Search fee paid | 23.09.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 23.09.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 23.09.2021 | Examination requested [2021/52] | 10.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 11.01.2024 | Communication of intention to grant the patent | 21.03.2024 | Fee for grant paid | 21.03.2024 | Fee for publishing/printing paid | 21.03.2024 | Receipt of the translation of the claim(s) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2013101123 (INTEL CORP [US], et al) | International search | [A]KR20050011152 (SAMSUNG ELECTRONICS CO LTD); | [Y]US2008320236 (UEDA MAKOTO [JP], et al); | [Y]KR20140124794 (QUALCOMM INC [US]); | [A]JP2016118818 (HONDA MOTOR CO LTD); | [YX]US2016328326 (DI BLAS ANDREA [US], et al) | by applicant | KR101355105B | KR20190116253 |