Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | US2022288817 | Global Dossier | 15.09.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP35071 | 16.09.2020 | JP2019172153 | 20.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | JP7182723B | Global Dossier | 02.12.2022 | B2 | JPWO2021054358 | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP35071 | 16.09.2020 | JP2019172153 | 20.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | CN114269550 | Global Dossier | 01.04.2022 | A | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP35071 | 16.09.2020 | JP2019172153 | 20.09.2019 | Type | Patent family member | Publication No. | Date | Type | EP4032676 | Global Dossier | 06.09.2023 | A4 | EP4032676 | 27.07.2022 | A1 | Priority number | Date | WO2020JP35071 | 16.09.2020 | JP2019172153 | 20.09.2019 | Type | Equivalent | Publication No. | Date | Type | WO2021054358 | Global Dossier | 25.03.2021 | A1 | Priority number | Date | JP2019172153 | 20.09.2019 |