EP4032676 - METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL MEMBER AND OPTICAL MEMBER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 24.06.2022 Database last updated on 07.10.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 27.03.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 21.09.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 2-1, Yaesu 2-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 104-0028 / JP | [2023/18] |
Former [2022/30] | For all designated states Mitsui Chemicals, Inc. 5-2, Higashi-Shimbashi 1-chome Minato-ku Tokyo 105-7122 / JP | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ITO, Shinsuke c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 30, Asamutacho Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | 02 /
RIBEIRO, Nigel c/o Mitsui Chemicals, Inc., 30, Asamutacho Omuta-shi, Fukuoka 836-8610 / JP | [2022/30] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/30] | Application number, filing date | 20866779.0 | 16.09.2020 | [2022/30] | WO2020JP35071 | Priority number, date | JP20190172153 | 20.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019172153 | [2022/30] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021054358 | Date: | 25.03.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/12] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4032676 | Date: | 27.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/30] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 25.03.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 03.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B29C39/02, B29C39/26, G02B3/00, G02B1/04, B29C33/38 | [2022/30] | CPC: |
B29C33/301 (EP);
B29D11/00413 (US);
B29C33/40 (EP,US);
B29C39/26 (EP,US);
B29D11/00009 (EP);
B29D11/0048 (EP);
B29D11/00538 (EP);
G02B1/04 (US);
B29K2081/00 (EP);
B29L2011/0016 (EP)
(-)
| C-Set: |
G02B1/041, C08L75/04, C08L81/00 (EP)
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/30] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINES OPTISCHEN ELEMENTS UND OPTISCHES ELEMENT | [2022/30] | English: | METHOD FOR PRODUCING OPTICAL MEMBER AND OPTICAL MEMBER | [2022/30] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE PRODUCTION D'UN ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE ET ÉLÉMENT OPTIQUE | [2022/30] | Entry into regional phase | 03.03.2022 | Translation filed | 03.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 03.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 03.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 03.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/30] | 01.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 22.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 19.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 20.09.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [I]JPS62212108 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [A]JP2001167473 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP) | International search | [Y]JPS5175762 (IG GIJUTSU KENKYUSHO KK); | [XY]JPS62212108 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XY]JP2000315315 (MATSUSHITA ELECTRIC IND CO LTD); | [XY]JP2001167473 (MITSUBISHI ENG PLASTICS CORP); | [Y]WO2006055677 (QSPEX L L C [US], et al); | [XY]JP2006235007 (CANON KK); | [XY]WO2010073625 (NIKON ESSILOR CO LTD [JP], et al); | [Y]JP2012232433 (PANASONIC CORP); | [XY]JP2017533180 | by applicant | JP2002194083 | JP2012000915 | JP2012017363 | WO2017159839 | JP2018154690 | JP2019001785 | JP2019172153 |