EP4041241 - METHODS FOR TREATING MYELOFIBROSIS AND RELATED CONDITIONS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 22.08.2024 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 15.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.08.2024 | New entry: Despatch of examination report + time limit | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Disc Medicine, Inc. 321 Arsenal Street, Suite 101 Watertown, MA 02472 / US | [2022/33] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
QUISEL, John 150 Cambridgepark Drive Suite 103 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 02 /
BECONI, Maria 150 Cambridgepark Drive Suite 103 Cambridge, MA 02140 / US | 03 /
ROBINETTE, Steven 89 Scribner Road Fremont, NH 03044 / US | 04 /
MACDONALD, Brian 19 Paper Mill Rd Newton Square, PA 19073 / US | [2022/33] | Representative(s) | Atkins, James Gordon John, et al Kilburn & Strode LLP Lacon London 84 Theobalds Road London WC1X 8NL / GB | [2022/33] | Application number, filing date | 20867029.9 | 25.09.2020 | [2022/33] | WO2020US52732 | Priority number, date | US201962907227P | 27.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962907227 P | US202063063761P | 10.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063063761 P | US202063072057P | 28.08.2020 Original published format: US 202063072057 P | [2022/33] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062163 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4041241 | Date: | 17.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/33] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | A61K31/519, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61K45/06, A61P29/00, A61P7/06, C07K16/28, // A61K38/00 | [2023/36] | CPC: |
C07K16/28 (EP,IL,KR,US);
A61K38/1709 (KR);
A61K31/454 (KR);
A61K31/55 (KR);
A61K38/00 (EP,IL);
A61K38/1816 (KR);
A61K39/3955 (US);
A61K45/06 (KR,US);
A61P7/06 (EP,IL,KR,US);
|
Former IPC [2022/33] | A61K31/519, A61K39/00, A61K39/395, A61K45/00, A61K45/06, A61P29/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/33] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR BEHANDLUNG VON MYELOFIBROSE UND VERWANDTEN ERKRANKUNGEN | [2022/33] | English: | METHODS FOR TREATING MYELOFIBROSIS AND RELATED CONDITIONS | [2022/33] | French: | PROCÉDÉS DE TRAITEMENT DE LA MYÉLOFIBROSE ET D'AFFECTIONS ASSOCIÉES | [2022/33] | Entry into regional phase | 26.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 26.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 26.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 26.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/33] | 04.03.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 04.03.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | 23.08.2024 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 27.09.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Cited in | International search | [Y]US2008213277 (SASU BARBRA [US], et al) [Y] 2 * entire document *; | [A]US7968091 (WOOLF CLIFFORD J [US], et al) [A] 1-6, 18-21, 80-93* entire document *; | [A]US9315577 (FOLTZ IAN [CA], et al) [A] 1-6, 18-21, 80-93 * entire document *; | [A]US2017313754 (BOURNE GREGORY THOMAS [AU], et al) [A] 1-6, 18-21, 80-93 * entire document *; | [Y]US2018016332 (SCHURPF THOMAS [US], et al) [Y] 21 * entire document *; | [XY]US2018050085 (KUMAR RAVINDRA [US], et al) [X] 1, 3-6, 80-82, 86, 87, 89, 91-93 * entire document * [Y] 2, 18-21, 83-85, 88, 90; | [Y]US2018057812 (PEYSSONNAUX CAROLE [FR], et al) [Y] 18-21 * entire document *; | [Y]US10246462 (BECK HILARY PLAKE [US], et al) [Y] 88, 90 * entire document *; | [Y] - Heinz Zoller, Theurl Igor, "Iron in Cancer, Infection, Kidney and Liver diseases: Innocent bystander or therapeutic target?", Bio Iron, (20190505), pages 1 - 67, URL: https://bioironforum.org/wp-content/uploads/2018/10/7.-Iron-in-cancer-infection-kideny-and-liver-diseases.Theurl-Zoller.pdf, (20200915), XP055730962 [Y] 83 * . entire document * | [Y] - Kovac Suzana, Preethne Böser, Yifang Cui, Dunja Ferring-Appel, Daniela Casarrubea, Lili Huang, Emma Fung, Andreas Popp, Bernhard K. Mueller,, "Anti-Hemojuvelin Antibody Corrects Anemia Caused by Inappropriately High Hepcidin Level", Haematologica, (20160501), vol. 101, no. 5, pages e173 - e176, XP055806880 [Y] 84, 85 * . entire document * |