EP3907792 - SILICON COMPOSITE NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND LITHIUM ION BATTERY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Examination is in progress Status updated on 15.04.2022 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 08.10.2021 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 05.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states BTR NEW MATERIAL GROUP CO., LTD. Building 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 7B and 8 High-tech Industrial Park Xitian Community Gongming Office, Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | For all designated states Dingyuan New Energy Technology Co., Ltd. High Temperature Calcining Plant (within BTR New Material Technology co. LTD Plant) Huyangkeng Region, Huangdong Village Zhenlong Town, Huiyang District Huizhou, Guangdong 516227 / CN | [2021/45] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
PANG, Chunlei Building 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 7B, And 8, High- tech Industrial Park Xitian Community, Gongming Office, Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | 02 /
SHI, Xiaotai Building 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 7B, And 8, High- tech Industrial Park Xitian Community, Gongming Office, Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | 03 /
WANG, Jingwei Building 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 7B, And 8, High- tech Industrial Park Xitian Community, Gongming Office, Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | 04 /
REN, Jianguo Building 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 7B, And 8, High- tech Industrial Park Xitian Community, Gongming Office, Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | 05 /
HE, Xueqin Building 1, 2, 3, 4, 5, 6, 7A, 7B, And 8, High- tech Industrial Park Xitian Community, Gongming Office, Guangming New District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | [N/P] |
Former [2021/45] | 01 /
PANG, Chunlei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | ||
02 /
SHI, Xiaotai Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | |||
03 /
WANG, Jingwei Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | |||
04 /
REN, Jianguo Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | |||
05 /
HE, Xueqin Shenzhen, Guangdong 518106 / CN | Representative(s) | Gerbino, Angelo, et al Jacobacci & Partners S.p.A. Corso Emilia 8 10152 Torino / IT | [2021/45] | Application number, filing date | 20867206.3 | 25.09.2020 | [2021/45] | WO2020CN117910 | Priority number, date | CN201910917536 | 26.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910917536 | [2021/45] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021057929 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP3907792 | Date: | 10.11.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/45] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 07.04.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H01M4/38 | [2021/45] | CPC: |
H01M4/386 (EP,CN,KR,US);
H01M4/366 (KR);
H01M4/364 (EP,KR,US);
C01B33/12 (US);
C01B33/22 (US);
C01B33/26 (US);
H01M10/052 (KR);
H01M10/0525 (CN,US);
H01M4/131 (EP);
H01M4/134 (EP);
H01M4/136 (EP);
H01M4/483 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/5825 (EP,KR,US);
H01M4/625 (KR,US);
H01M4/628 (CN);
C01P2002/85 (US);
C01P2004/03 (US);
C01P2004/61 (US);
C01P2006/12 (US);
C01P2006/40 (US);
H01M2004/021 (US);
| Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2021/45] | Title | German: | NEGATIVELEKTRODENMATERIAL AUS SILICIUMVERBUNDSTOFF UND HERSTELLUNGSVERFAHREN DAFÜR UND LITHIUM-IONEN-BATTERIE | [2021/45] | English: | SILICON COMPOSITE NEGATIVE ELECTRODE MATERIAL AND PREPARATION METHOD THEREFOR, AND LITHIUM ION BATTERY | [2021/45] | French: | MATÉRIAU D'ÉLECTRODE NÉGATIVE DE COMPOSITE DE SILICIUM ET SON PROCÉDÉ DE PRÉPARATION, ET BATTERIE AU LITHIUM-ION | [2021/45] | Entry into regional phase | 02.08.2021 | Translation filed | 02.08.2021 | National basic fee paid | 02.08.2021 | Search fee paid | 02.08.2021 | Designation fee(s) paid | 02.08.2021 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 02.08.2021 | Examination requested [2021/45] | 21.04.2022 | Despatch of a communication from the examining division (Time limit: M04) | 30.08.2022 | Reply to a communication from the examining division | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 23.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 04.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 02.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [ ] - No further relevant documents disclosed |