EP4036032 - DISPENSER [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 11.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 24.07.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Kao Corporation 14-10, Nihonbashi-Kayabacho 1-chome Chuo-ku Tokyo 103-8210 / JP | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
YAMADA, Takashi c/o Kao Corporation, Research Laboratories, 2-1-3 Bunka, Sumida-ku Tokyo 131-0044 / JP | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Vossius & Partner Patentanwälte Rechtsanwälte mbB Siebertstraße 3 81675 München / DE | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20867276.6 | 17.07.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020JP27976 | Priority number, date | JP20190174810 | 25.09.2019 Original published format: JP 2019174810 | [2022/31] | Filing language | JA | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021059697 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | JA | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4036032 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | JP | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 14.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | B65D47/34, B05B11/10, B05B11/00, B05B15/62, F04B9/14, F04B43/02 | [2023/42] | CPC: |
F04B43/02 (EP);
B05B11/10 (CN);
B05B11/1032 (EP,US);
B05B11/0064 (US);
B05B11/1042 (CN);
F04B9/14 (EP);
B05B11/007 (EP);
B05B11/1045 (EP);
B05B11/1069 (EP);
B05B15/62 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | B65D83/00, B65D47/34 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | SPENDER | [2022/31] | English: | DISPENSER | [2022/31] | French: | DISTRIBUTEUR | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 18.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 09.04.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 09.04.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 18.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.07.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 24.07.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]JP2001180728 (KIYOTA ENGINEERING KK) [Y] 7-9 * abstract ** paragraph [0008] - paragraph [0029] *; | [Y]US2006049208 (DAANSEN WARREN S [US]) [Y] 4 * abstract * * paragraph [0018] - paragraph [0021] *; | [XYI]EP2559492 (MEADWESTVACO CALMAR NETHERLANDS B V [US]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-12 * abstract * * paragraph [0030] - paragraph [0041] * [Y] 4,7-9 [I] 2; | [X]WO2017109665 (TAPLAST SRL [IT]) [X] 1,3,5,6,10-12 * abstract * | International search | [A]JPH0692383 (HAYAKAWA SANKI KK) [A] 1-12 * , paragraphs [0021]-[0033], fig. 1-8 *; | [Y]JP2001180728 (KIYOTA ENGINEERING KK) [Y] 7-9 * , paragraphs [0008]-[0029], fig. 1-4 *; | [Y]US2006049208 (DAANSEN WARREN S [US]) [Y] 4-9 * , paragraphs [0018]-[0021], fig. 1 *; | [A]JP2007509827 (SEAQUIST CLOSURES) [A] 1-12* , paragraphs [0016]-[0055], fig. 1-21 *; | [XY]JP2012522184 (MEADWESTVACO CALMAR NETHERLANDS B V) [X] 1-3, 10-12 * , paragraphs [0010]-[0056], fig. 1-15, paragraphs [0010]-[0056], fig. 1-15 * [Y] 4-9 | by applicant | US2071977 |