EP4019672 - MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON SHEET [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 27.05.2022 Database last updated on 25.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 23.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Ding, Xin Room 202 No.7 Haiyang Road 1001 Pudong District Shanghai 200123 / CN | [2022/26] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
see applicant ... | [2022/26] | Representative(s) | FARAGO Patentanwälte GmbH Schloß-Rahe-Straße 15 52072 Aachen / DE | [N/P] |
Former [2022/26] | FARAGO Patentanwaltsgesellschaft mbH Schloß-Rahe-Straße 15 52072 Aachen / DE | Application number, filing date | 20867543.9 | 15.09.2020 | [2022/26] | WO2020CN115225 | Priority number, date | CN201910909721 | 25.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910909721 | [2022/26] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021057542 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4019672 | Date: | 29.06.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/26] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 31.07.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C30B25/20, C30B25/18, C23C16/455, H01L21/02, H01L31/18, C30B25/22, C30B29/06 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C30B25/186 (EP,CN);
C30B25/18 (KR);
H01L31/1804 (EP,US);
C23C16/01 (EP);
C23C16/0227 (EP);
C23C16/24 (EP);
C23C16/4412 (EP);
C30B25/20 (EP,CN,KR);
C30B25/22 (EP);
C30B29/06 (EP,CN,KR);
H01L21/02381 (EP);
H01L21/0245 (EP);
H01L21/02513 (EP);
H01L21/02532 (EP);
H01L21/02598 (EP);
H01L21/0262 (EP);
H01L31/036 (US);
H01L31/1896 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/26] | C30B25/20, C30B25/18 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/26] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR HERSTELLUNG EINER MONOKRISTALLINEN SILIZIUMSCHICHT | [2022/26] | English: | MANUFACTURING METHOD FOR MONOCRYSTALLINE SILICON SHEET | [2022/26] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE FABRICATION DE FEUILLE DE SILICIUM MONOCRISTALLIN | [2022/26] | Entry into regional phase | 24.03.2022 | Translation filed | 24.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 24.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 24.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 24.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/26] | 22.02.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 22.02.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 24.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 02.10.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XYI]JPH09255487 (SONY CORP) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraphs [0001] , [0005] , [0010] , [0025] , [0028] - [0030] - [0043] , [0045] - [0047]; figures 1-4; claims 1,4 * [Y] 6 [I] 8,9; | [Y]EP2239353 (AIR LIQUIDE [FR]) [Y] 6* paragraphs [0018] , [0027] , [0034] , [0044] , [0045]; figure 2; claims 1,4,5 * |