EP4037220 - METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 13.08.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vivo Mobile Communication Co., Ltd. No.1, Vivo Road Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
SHEN, Xiaodong No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | 02 /
LI, Na No.168 Jinghai East Rd., Chang'an Dongguan, Guangdong 523863 / CN | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Murgitroyd & Company 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | [N/P] |
Former [2022/31] | Murgitroyd & Company Murgitroyd House 165-169 Scotland Street Glasgow G5 8PL / GB | Application number, filing date | 20867678.3 | 22.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020CN116916 | Priority number, date | CN201910927170 | 27.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910927170 | [2022/31] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021057737 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4037220 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 20.10.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04L1/18, H04L5/00, H04L1/00, H04W72/12, H04W72/04 | [2022/47] | CPC: |
H04L1/0008 (EP);
H04L5/0053 (EP,CN,KR);
H04L1/1812 (CN,KR);
H04W72/21 (EP,KR,US);
H04L1/0013 (EP);
H04L1/0041 (EP);
H04L1/0072 (EP);
H04L1/1854 (KR);
H04L5/0055 (EP);
H04L5/0058 (EP);
H04L1/1864 (EP);
H04L1/1893 (EP);
H04L5/0092 (EP)
(-)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | H04L1/18, H04L5/00 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | VERFAHREN ZUR ÜBERTRAGUNG VON UPLINK-STEUERUNGSINFORMATIONEN, ENDGERÄT UND NETZWERKVORRICHTUNG | [2022/31] | English: | METHOD FOR TRANSMITTING UPLINK CONTROL INFORMATION, TERMINAL DEVICE, AND NETWORK DEVICE | [2022/31] | French: | PROCÉDÉ DE TRANSMISSION D'INFORMATIONS DE COMMANDE DE LIAISON MONTANTE, DISPOSITIF TERMINAL ET DISPOSITIF DE RÉSEAU | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 20.04.2022 | Translation filed | 20.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 20.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 20.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 20.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 07.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 07.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 11.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 24.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 13.08.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XAI]US2018167931 (PAPASAKELLARIOU ARIS [US]); | [XAI]US2019199477 (PARK HANJUN [KR], et al); | [XAI]WO2019134083 (PANASONIC IP CORP AMERICA [US]) |