EP4024913 - NETWORK SLICE CHARGING METHOD AND DEVICE [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | Request for examination was made Status updated on 03.06.2022 Database last updated on 14.09.2024 | |
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 29.03.2024 | New entry: Renewal fee paid | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Huawei Technologies Co., Ltd. Huawei Administration Building Bantian Longgang District Shenzhen Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
ZHU, Lei Huawei Administration Building, Bantian, Longgang District Shenzhen, Guangdong 518129 / CN | [2022/27] | Representative(s) | Gill Jennings & Every LLP The Broadgate Tower 20 Primrose Street London EC2A 2ES / GB | [2022/27] | Application number, filing date | 20868159.3 | 24.04.2020 | [2022/27] | WO2020CN86880 | Priority number, date | CN201910936221 | 29.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910936221 | [2022/27] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021057020 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4024913 | Date: | 06.07.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/27] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 30.09.2022 | Classification | IPC: | H04W4/24, H04L12/14, H04M15/00 | [2022/44] | CPC: |
H04W4/24 (EP,CN);
H04L12/1407 (EP,CN,US);
H04L12/14 (EP);
H04L12/1414 (EP,US);
H04M15/00 (EP);
H04M15/41 (EP);
H04M15/61 (EP);
H04M15/66 (EP,CN);
H04M15/785 (EP);
|
Former IPC [2022/27] | H04W4/24 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/27] | Title | German: | NETZWERK-SLICE-AUSWAHLVERFAHREN UND -VORRICHTUNG | [2022/27] | English: | NETWORK SLICE CHARGING METHOD AND DEVICE | [2022/27] | French: | PROCÉDÉ ET DISPOSITIF DE FACTURATION DE TRANCHE DE RÉSEAU | [2022/27] | Entry into regional phase | 31.03.2022 | Translation filed | 31.03.2022 | National basic fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Search fee paid | 31.03.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 31.03.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 31.03.2022 | Examination requested [2022/27] | 17.04.2023 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 17.04.2023 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 31.03.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.03.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 | 28.03.2024 | Renewal fee patent year 05 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [Y]WO2019182493 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [Y] 1-13 * page 6 * * paragraph [0100] - paragraph [0104] *; | [Y] - NOKIA ET AL, "Network Slice Management charging - solution", vol. SA WG5, no. Sapporo, Japan; 20190625 - 20190628, (20190628), 3GPP DRAFT; S5-194347 REL-16 PCR TR 32.845 NETWORK SLICE MANAGEMENT CHARGING - SOLUTION, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPETENCE CENTRE ; 650, ROUTE DES LUCIOLES ; F-06921 SOPHIA-, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/SA5/Docs/S5%2D194347%2Ezip, (20190628), XP051749988 [Y] 1-13 * the whole document * | [Y] - HUAWEI ET AL, "Addition of a few editorial corrections and many clarifications between NW Slice and NW Slice Instance", vol. SA WG5, no. Taipei,Taiwan; 20190225 - 20190301, (20190228), 3GPP DRAFT; S5-192295 REL-16 PCR 32.845 ADDITION OF A FEW EDITORIAL CORRECTIONS AND MANY CLARIFICATIONS BETWEEN NW SLICE AND NW SLICE INSTANCE, 3RD GENERATION PARTNERSHIP PROJECT (3GPP), MOBILE COMPET, URL: http://www.3gpp.org/ftp/Meetings%5F3GPP%5FSYNC/SA5/Docs/S5%2D192295%2Ezip, (20190228), XP051597744 [Y] 6-13 * the whole document * | International search | [A]US2018316564 (SENARATH NIMAL GAMINI [CA]) [A] 1-12, 15-26, 29-30, 32 * description, paragraphs 77-105 *; | [A]CN109873730 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A]CN110213800 (CHINA UNICOM) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [X]CN110225474 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [X] 13, 27, 31-32 * description, paragraphs 137-162 *; | [A]CN110225474 (HUAWEI TECH CO LTD) [A] 14, 28 * description, paragraphs 137-162 *; | [A]WO2019182493 (ERICSSON TELEFON AB L M [SE]) [A] 1-32 * entire document *; | [A] - "3rd Generation Partnership Project; Technical Specification Group Services and System Aspects; Study on security aspects of 5G network slicing management (Release 15)", 3GPP Standard; Technical Report; 3GPP TR 33.811, 3rd Generation Partnership Project (3GPP), Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, Mobile Competence Centre ; 650, route des Lucioles ; F-06921 Sophia-Antipolis Cedex ; France, (20180605), vol. SA WG3, no. V1.0.0, pages 1 - 19, XP051451581 [A] 1-32 * entire document * |