EP4034107 - JAK INHIBITORS [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 27.06.2024 Database last updated on 03.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 01.07.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 27.06.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 31.07.2024 [2024/31] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Vimalan Biosciences, Inc. 662 Encinitas Blvd., Suite 250 Encinitas, CA 92024 / US | [2022/31] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
MOHAN, Raju 662 Encinitas Blvd. Suite 250 Encinitas, California 92024 / US | 02 /
NUSS, John 662 Encinitas Blvd. Suite 250 Encinitas, California 92024 / US | 03 /
HARRIS, Jason 662 Encinitas Blvd. Suite 250 Encinitas, California 92024 / US | 04 /
YUAN, Shendong 662 Encinitas Blvd. Suite 250 Encinitas, California 92024 / US | [2022/31] | Representative(s) | Mewburn Ellis LLP Aurora Building Counterslip Bristol BS1 6BX / GB | [2022/31] | Application number, filing date | 20868450.6 | 24.09.2020 | [2022/31] | WO2020US52556 | Priority number, date | US201962905958P | 25.09.2019 Original published format: US 201962905958 P | [2022/31] | Filing language | EN | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021062036 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | EN | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4034107 | Date: | 03.08.2022 | Language: | EN | The application published by WIPO in one of the EPO official languages on 01.04.2021 takes the place of the publication of the European patent application. | [2022/31] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | US | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 01.08.2023 | Classification | IPC: | C07D487/04, A61P37/00, A61K31/4155 | [2023/35] | CPC: |
C07D487/04 (EP,IL,US);
A61P37/00 (EP)
|
Former IPC [2022/31] | A61K31/4155, C07D403/14, C07D487/04 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/31] | Title | German: | JAK-INHIBITOREN | [2022/31] | English: | JAK INHIBITORS | [2022/31] | French: | INHIBITEURS DE JAK | [2022/31] | Entry into regional phase | 05.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 05.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 05.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 05.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | 05.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/31] | 09.11.2022 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 01.03.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/31] | 22.03.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/31] | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 27.09.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | Penalty fee | Additional fee for renewal fee | 30.09.2023 | 04   M06   Not yet paid |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [IA]WO2012143320 (CELLZOME LTD [GB], et al) [I] 1-5,7-10,12-14 * claim 1 * * page 58, lines 19-20 * [A] 6,11; | [A]CN108864057 (UNIV SHANDONG) [A] 1-14* claim 1; compound III * | International search | [A]US2012207763 (BRAIN CHRISTOPHER THOMAS [US], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *; | [A]WO2012143320 (CELLZOME LTD [GB], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *; | [A]US8580802 (SALITURO FRANCESCO [US], et al) [A] 1 * entire document *; | [A]US9642855 (GALATSIS PAUL [US], et al) [A] 1* entire document * | [A] - Anonymous, PUBCHEM SUBSTANCE, (20170804), Database accession no. SID 340331023, URL: NCBI [A] 1 * entire document * |