EP4080189 - PARTICULATE MATTER SENSOR AND VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONER ASSEMBLY [Right-click to bookmark this link] | Status | The application is deemed to be withdrawn Status updated on 08.08.2024 Database last updated on 05.10.2024 | |
Former | Request for examination was made Status updated on 23.09.2022 | ||
Former | The international publication has been made Status updated on 03.04.2021 | Most recent event Tooltip | 08.08.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn | published on 11.09.2024 [2024/37] | Applicant(s) | For all designated states Valeo Automotive Air Conditioning Hubei Co., Ltd. No. 285, West Jiangjin Road Shashi District Jingzhou, Hubei 434007 / CN | [2022/43] | Inventor(s) | 01 /
GE, Zhongdong No. 285, West Jiangjin Road, Shashi District Jingzhou, Hubei 434007 / CN | 02 /
BAO, Tao No. 285, West Jiangjin Road, Shashi District Jingzhou, Hubei 434007 / CN | [2022/43] | Representative(s) | Valeo Systèmes Thermiques Service Propriété Intellectuelle 8, rue Louis Lormand La Verrière 78320 Le Mesnil Saint Denis / FR | [2022/43] | Application number, filing date | 20868465.4 | 23.09.2020 | [2022/43] | WO2020CN117143 | Priority number, date | CN201910903346 | 24.09.2019 Original published format: CN201910903346 | [2022/43] | Filing language | ZH | Procedural language | EN | Publication | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | WO2021057792 | Date: | 01.04.2021 | Language: | ZH | [2021/13] | Type: | A1 Application with search report | No.: | EP4080189 | Date: | 26.10.2022 | Language: | EN | [2022/43] | Search report(s) | International search report - published on: | CN | 01.04.2021 | (Supplementary) European search report - dispatched on: | EP | 29.09.2023 | Classification | IPC: | G01N15/06, G01N15/02, G01N15/00 | [2023/44] | CPC: |
G01N15/0205 (EP,CN);
B60H1/008 (CN);
G01N15/06 (EP,CN);
G01N15/075 (EP,CN);
G01N2015/0046 (EP);
G01N2015/0238 (CN)
|
Former IPC [2022/43] | G01N15/06 | Designated contracting states | AL, AT, BE, BG, CH, CY, CZ, DE, DK, EE, ES, FI, FR, GB, GR, HR, HU, IE, IS, IT, LI, LT, LU, LV, MC, MK, MT, NL, NO, PL, PT, RO, RS, SE, SI, SK, SM, TR [2022/43] | Title | German: | PARTIKELSENSOR UND FAHRZEUGKLIMAANLAGENANORDNUNG | [2022/43] | English: | PARTICULATE MATTER SENSOR AND VEHICLE AIR CONDITIONER ASSEMBLY | [2022/43] | French: | CAPTEUR DE MATIÈRE PARTICULAIRE ET ENSEMBLE CLIMATISEUR DE VÉHICULE | [2022/43] | Entry into regional phase | 14.09.2022 | Translation filed | 22.04.2022 | National basic fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Search fee paid | 22.04.2022 | Designation fee(s) paid | 22.04.2022 | Examination fee paid | Examination procedure | deleted | Deletion: Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2022/43] | 22.04.2022 | Examination requested [2022/43] | 18.04.2024 | Application deemed to be withdrawn, date of legal effect [2024/37] | 27.05.2024 | Despatch of communication that the application is deemed to be withdrawn, reason: reply to the communication from the examining division not received in time [2024/37] | 29.07.2024 | Amendment by applicant (claims and/or description) | 29.07.2024 | Date on which the examining division has become responsible | Request for further processing for: | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to reply to the Extended European Search Report/Written Opinion of the International Searching Authority/International Preliminary Examination Report/Supplementary international search report/Supplementary European search report | 29.07.2024 | Request for further processing filed | 29.07.2024 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) | The application is deemed to be withdrawn due to failure to file the translation | 14.09.2022 | Request for further processing filed | 14.09.2022 | Full payment received (date of receipt of payment) Request granted | 20.09.2022 | Decision despatched | Fees paid | Renewal fee | 26.08.2022 | Renewal fee patent year 03 | 22.08.2023 | Renewal fee patent year 04 |
Opt-out from the exclusive Tooltip competence of the Unified Patent Court | See the Register of the Unified Patent Court for opt-out data | ||
Responsibility for the accuracy, completeness or quality of the data displayed under the link provided lies entirely with the Unified Patent Court. | Documents cited: | Search | [XI]WO2017220618 (PRODRIVE TECH BV [NL]) [X] 1-7,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0083]; figures 1-6 * [I] 8,9; | [X]US2019072473 (KNOELLER RAINER [DE], et al) [X] 1-5,7 * paragraph [0082]; figure 6D *; | [X]CN109655387 (WENZHOU JIAXU CONSTRUCTION SUPERVISION CONSULTING CO LTD) [X] 1-3* the whole document *; | [X]WO2019172853 (INNOSPARKS PTE LTD [SG]) [X] 1-3,5,6,10 * paragraphs [0006] - [0032]; figures 1-5 * |